IN SB0410 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-3)
Status: Passed on March 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-18 - Public Law 88
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-3)
Status: Passed on March 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-18 - Public Law 88
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Libraries. Makes changes to statutes applicable to the review of budgets of certain public libraries. Establishes a procedure for public libraries to identify the applicable city, town, or county fiscal body to receive a public library's proposed budget. Includes public libraries in the definition of "qualified entities" for purposes of criminal background checks. Requires, before December 31, 2020, a public library to adopt a policy regarding conducting criminal background checks for individuals who are more than 18 years of age and who: (1) apply to the public library for employment or volunteer work; or (2) are currently employed by or perform volunteer work for the public library. Provides that a library board may issue a local library card without charge or for a reduced fee to an individual who is not a resident of the library district and who is a child receiving foster care services.
Title
Libraries.
Sponsors
Sen. Susan Glick [R] | Sen. Andy Zay [R] | Sen. Linda Rogers [R] | Sen. Timothy Lanane [D] |
Sen. James Tomes [R] | Sen. Dennis Kruse [R] | Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] | Rep. David Abbott [R] |
Rep. Jim Pressel [R] | Rep. Doug Miller [R] | Rep. Rita Fleming [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-02 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-18 | Senate | Public Law 88 |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2020-03-16 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2020-03-03 | House | Returned to the Senate without amendments |
2020-03-02 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 242: yeas 89, nays 0 |
2020-02-27 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2020-02-24 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2020-02-17 | House | Representatives Miller and Fleming added as cosponsors |
2020-02-11 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Local Government |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Cosponsor: Representative Pressel |
2020-02-04 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Abbott |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 187: yeas 49, nays 0 |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as coauthor |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Senator Kruse added as coauthor |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Senator Tomes added as coauthor |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Senator Rogers added as third author |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Senator Lanane added as coauthor |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Senator Zay added as second author |
2020-01-14 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Local Government |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Authored by Senator Glick |