IN SB0410 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on March 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-16 - Public Law 129
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on March 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-16 - Public Law 129
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Advanced practice registered nurses. Replaces the term "advanced practice nurse" with "advanced practice registered nurse" throughout the Indiana Code. Requires the Indiana state board of nursing to adopt rules concerning educational and certification requirements that an advanced practice registered nurse must meet to be authorized to prescribe drugs.
Title
Advanced practice registered nurses. Replaces the term "advanced practice nurse" with "advanced practice registered nurse" throughout the Indiana Code. Requires the Indiana state board of nursing to adopt rules concerning educational and certification requirements that an advanced practice registered nurse must meet to be authorized to prescribe drugs.
Sponsors
Sen. Ed Charbonneau [R] | Sen. Elizabeth Brown [R] | Sen. Jean Leising [R] | Sen. Joseph Zakas [R] |
Rep. Cindy Kirchhofer [R] | Rep. Ronald Bacon [R] | Rep. Robin Shackleford [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-07 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-16 | Senate | Public Law 129 |
2018-03-16 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2018-03-14 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Joint Rule 20 technical correction adopted by the Senate |
2018-03-13 | House | Joint Rule 20 technical correction adopted by the House |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 365: yeas 46, nays 0 |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Motion to concur filed |
2018-02-28 | House | Returned to the Senate with amendments |
2018-02-27 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 255: yeas 94, nays 0 |
2018-02-26 | House | Representative Shackleford added as cosponsor |
2018-02-26 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2018-02-22 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2018-02-12 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Public Health |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Cosponsor: Representative Bacon |
2018-02-06 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Kirchhofer |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 192: yeas 47, nays 0 |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Senator Zakas added as coauthor |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Senator Leising added as third author |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Senator Brown L added as second author |
2018-01-10 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Authored by Senator Charbonneau |