IN SB0409 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-27 - Public Law 214
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-27 - Public Law 214
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Collective bargaining. Provides that formal collective bargaining between a school corporation and an exclusive representative may not begin before September 15. Provides that before September 15 of the first year of the state budget biennium, the department of education shall provide the parties with an estimate of the general fund revenue available for bargaining in the school corporation from the school funding formula. Provides that if the parties do not receive a certified estimate from the department of education within 30 days after the fall count of ADM, the parties may use the school corporation's estimate of the general fund
Title
Collective bargaining. Provides that formal collective bargaining between a school corporation and an exclusive representative may not begin before September 15. Provides that before September 15 of the first year of the state budget biennium, the department of education shall provide the parties with an estimate of the general fund revenue available for bargaining in the school corporation from the school funding formula. Provides that if the parties do not receive a certified estimate from the department of education within 30 days after the fall count of ADM, the parties may use the school corporation's estimate of the general fund
Sponsors
Sen. Erin Houchin [R] | Sen. Philip Boots [R] | Sen. Dennis Kruse [R] | Sen. David Niezgodski [D] |
Rep. Gerald Torr [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-11 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House Amendments (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-27 | Senate | Public Law 214 |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2017-04-19 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Senate concurred in House Amendments; Roll Call 452: yeas 48, nays 0 |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Motion to concur filed |
2017-04-05 | House | Returned to the Senate with amendments |
2017-04-04 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 379: yeas 99, nays 0 |
2017-04-03 | House | Amendment #5 (Behning) prevailed; voice vote |
2017-04-03 | House | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2017-03-21 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2017-03-07 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Education |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2017-01-31 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Torr |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 51: yeas 49, nays 0 |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Senator Niezgodski added as coauthor |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Senator Kruse added as third author |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Senator Boots added as second author |
2017-01-10 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Pensions and Labor |
2017-01-10 | Senate | Authored by Senator Houchin |