IN SB0409 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-13 - Public Law 254
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-13 - Public Law 254
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Teacher preparation programs.
Title
Teacher preparation programs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-18 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-04-15 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 80 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2013-02-26 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 39 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-15 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 80 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2013-02-26 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 39 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-13 | House | Public Law 254 |
2013-05-11 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2013-04-29 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2013-04-27 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2013-04-26 | House | Joint Rule 20 technical correction adopted by the House |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Joint Rule 20 technical correction adopted by the Senate |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 495: yeas 43, nays 0 |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Motion to concur in House amendments filed |
2013-04-15 | House | Returned to the Senate with amendments |
2013-04-15 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 494: yeas 80, nays 10 |
2013-04-10 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2013-04-08 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2013-03-04 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Education |
2013-02-26 | Senate | House sponsor: Rep. Behning |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 229: yeas 39 and nays 11 |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Senator Rogers added as coauthor |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Amendment 2 (Banks), prevailed; voice vote |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2013-01-10 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Education and Career Development |
2013-01-10 | Senate | Authored by Senators Banks, Kruse and Yoder |