IN SB0407 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-03-04 - First reading: referred to Committee on Rules and Legislative Procedures
Pending: House Rules and Legislative Procedures Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

State disaster emergencies. Provides that federal economic stimulus funds (funds) disbursed to the state during a period in which the general assembly is convened in regular or special session are subject to appropriation by the general assembly, and if the funds are disbursed in a period in which the general assembly is not convened in regular or special session, then the allotment of those funds is subject to review by the state budget committee. Establishes the legislative state of disaster advisory group to: (1) consult with, receive information from, and advise the governor concerning a widespread disaster emergency; (2) review, evaluate, and make recommendations with respect to a widespread disaster emergency; and (3) inform the members of the general assembly concerning the advisory group's work and the widespread disaster emergency. Provides that a disaster emergency affecting 10 or more counties may be extended beyond its initial period, or beyond an extension authorized by the general assembly to a specified date: (1) by not more than 15 days if the general assembly is not in session and the governor does not call the general assembly into session; (2) by not more than 30 days if, during the first fifteen (15) days following the governor's renewal, the general assembly is in session or the governor calls the general assembly into session, but the general assembly does not authorize a renewal of the disaster emergency; or (3) to a specified date fixed by the general assembly, if the general assembly authorizes a renewal of the disaster emergency. Prohibits the governor from declaring a new disaster emergency within 180 days of the termination of a previous disaster emergency if the: (1) new disaster emergency is based on the same or a similar cause as the previous disaster emergency; and (2) the previous disaster emergency was terminated by the general assembly or expired because the general assembly did not reauthorize it. Specifies that, during a special session called to authorize the extension of a disaster emergency, the general assembly may only consider upon issues related to the disaster. Makes a violation of the disaster law chapter or an order authorized by that chapter a Class B infraction.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State disaster emergencies.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 38 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-04HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Rules and Legislative Procedures
2021-02-24SenateReferred to the House
2021-02-23SenateSenator Houchin added as third author
2021-02-23SenateHouse sponsor: Representative Lehman
2021-02-23SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 202: yeas 38, nays 8
2021-02-22SenateSenator Messmer added as second author
2021-02-22SenateAmendment #1 (Glick) prevailed; voice vote
2021-02-22SenateSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2021-02-18SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2021-01-25SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Rules and Legislative Procedure
2021-01-25SenateAuthored by Senator Glick

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2021/bills/senate/407/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/d/2/6/4d26e861/SB0407.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/0/8/4/5084a5bd/SB0407.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/e/e/5/1ee503ec/SB0407.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/9/3/a/c93a100f/SB0407.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/1/2/e/412e32c0/SB0407.03.ENGS.pdf
Amendmenthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/4/e/f/34ef3396/SB0407.02.COMS.AMS001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/9/f/f/d9ff9d81/SB0407.01.INTR.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/4/4/6/64467d65/SB0407.01.INTR.CRS001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/7/f/6/27f6e46b/SB0407.02.COMS.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/5/8/1/75814eb7/SB0407.03.ENGS.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/b/4/1/7b41349f/SB0407.03.ENGS.FN002.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/d/6/3/cd63ad42/SB0407.01.INTR.03.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/8/a/c/38ac5b9d/SB0407.202_S.pdf

Bill Comments 750

feedback