IN SB0406 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-6)
Status: Passed on April 17 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-17 - Public Law 32
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Overdose intervention drugs. Requires certain emergency personnel to report to the state department of health the number of times an overdose intervention medication is administered. Allows specified health care professionals with prescriptive authority to dispense, write a prescription, or prepare a standing order for an overdose intervention drug without examining the individual to whom it may be administered if specified conditions are met. Allows for an individual who is a person at risk, a family member, friend, or other individual or entity in a position to assist another individual who, there is reason to believe, is at risk of experiencing

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Overdose intervention drugs. Requires certain emergency personnel to report to the state department of health the number of times an overdose intervention medication is administered. Allows specified health care professionals with prescriptive authority to dispense, write a prescription, or prepare a standing order for an overdose intervention drug without examining the individual to whom it may be administered if specified conditions are met. Allows for an individual who is a person at risk, a family member, friend, or other individual or entity in a position to assist another individual who, there is reason to believe, is at risk of experiencing

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-04-15 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House Amendments (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-04-01 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - Senate - Senate Committee on Health & Provider Services - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-04-17SenatePublic Law 32
2015-04-17SenateSigned by the Governor
2015-04-16SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2015-04-16SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2015-04-16HouseSigned by the Speaker
2015-04-15SenateSenate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 477: yeas 50, nays 0
2015-04-14SenateMotion to concur filed
2015-04-14HouseReturned to the Senate with amendments
2015-04-14SenateSenator Alting added as coauthor
2015-04-14HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 420: yeas 95, nays 0
2015-04-13HouseAmendment #2 (McMillin) prevailed; voice vote
2015-04-13HouseSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2015-04-02HouseRepresentative Shackleford added as cosponsor
2015-04-02HouseRule 105.1 suspended
2015-04-02HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2015-03-23HouseRepresentative Brown, C. added as cosponsor
2015-03-23HouseRepresentative Macer added as cosponsor
2015-03-23HouseRule 105.1 suspended
2015-03-23HouseRule 105.1 suspended
2015-03-17HouseRepresentative Clere added as cosponsor
2015-03-17HouseRule 105.1 suspended
2015-03-10HouseRepresentative Davisson added as cosponsor
2015-03-03HouseFirst Reading: referred to Committee on Public Health
2015-02-16SenateReferred to the House
2015-02-10SenateSenator Randolph added as coauthor
2015-02-10SenateRepresentative Ziemke added as cosponsor
2015-02-10SenateRepresentative McMillin added as sponsor
2015-02-10SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 128: yeas 50, nays 0
2015-02-09SenateAmendment #2 (Mrvan) prevailed; voice vote
2015-02-09SenateAmendment #1 (Merritt) prevailed; voice vote
2015-02-09SenateSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2015-02-05SenateSenators Breaux, Mrvan, Charbonneau, Becker added as coauthors
2015-02-05SenateSenator Crider added as third author
2015-02-05SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2015-01-12SenateSenator Leising added as coauthor
2015-01-12SenateSenator Ford added as second author
2015-01-12SenateFirst Reading: referred to Committee on Health & Provider Services
2015-01-12SenateAuthored by Senator Merritt

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2015/bills/senate/406/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/b/9/f/4b9fb937/SB0406.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/f/c/f/dfcfea99/SB0406.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/5/5/a/755a0f0c/SB0406.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/2/7/c/727c371e/SB0406.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/a/9/6/7a96809c/SB0406.03.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/a/c/4/bac4877c/SB0406.03.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/f/9/0/5f908aa7/SB0406.04.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/6/f/3/16f386c5/SB0406.04.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/9/c/a/79ca67ce/SB0406.05.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/0/9/2/f09299e7/SB0406.05.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/5/6/a/a56af5f3/SB0406.06.ENRS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/6/7/1/4671c81e/SB0406.01.INTR.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/9/d/3/e9d39e9a/SB0406.128.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/c/7/4/0c7422e9/SB0406.03.ENGS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/1/6/4/b164d195/SB0406.420.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/f/1/9/ff194985/SB0406.477.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback