IN SB0405 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Public Law 34
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Election audits. Allows the secretary of state to designate counties as risk-limiting audit pilot counties and sets forth a procedure for a county to follow to be designated as a pilot county to conduct risk-limiting audits. Provides for conducting election procedure audits after an election. Authorizes the secretary of state to adopt rules detailing procedures for such audits.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Election audits. Allows the secretary of state to designate counties as risk-limiting audit pilot counties and sets forth a procedure for a county to follow to be designated as a pilot county to conduct risk-limiting audits. Provides for conducting election procedure audits after an election. Authorizes the secretary of state to adopt rules detailing procedures for such audits.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-19 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-18SenatePublic Law 34
2019-04-18SenateSigned by the Governor
2019-04-17SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-03-28HouseSigned by the Speaker
2019-03-25HouseRepresentative Soliday added as cosponsor
2019-03-21SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2019-03-20HouseReturned to the Senate without amendments
2019-03-19HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 326: yeas 92, nays 0
2019-03-18HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2019-03-14HouseCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2019-03-05HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Elections and Apportionment
2019-02-12SenateReferred to the House
2019-02-11SenateSenator Zay added as coauthor
2019-02-11SenateSenator Bohacek added as coauthor
2019-02-11SenateHouse sponsor: Representative Wesco
2019-02-11SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 98: yeas 49, nays 0
2019-02-07SenateSenator Crane added as second author
2019-02-07SenateSenator Crane removed as coauthor
2019-02-07SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2019-02-05SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2019-02-04SenateSenator Houchin added as coauthor
2019-02-04SenateSenator Crane added as coauthor
2019-01-14SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Elections
2019-01-14SenateAuthored by Senator Spartz

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2019/bills/senate/405/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/f/c/d/7fcd7a9f/SB0405.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/2/9/f/629f712e/SB0405.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/2/3/0/22300453/SB0405.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/6/e/5/a6e5cea8/SB0405.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/c/1/a/6c1a5a32/SB0405.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/9/a/6/59a62871/SB0405.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/4/7/2/247287ef/SB0405.04.ENRH.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/4/3/3/5433b2c1/SB0405.01.INTR.01.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/f/0/5/9f053f31/SB0405.98.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/2/9/3/e2934047/SB0405.02.COMS.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/8/b/c/f8bcc957/SB0405.326.pdf

Bill Comments 750

feedback