IN SB0404 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on March 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-13 - Public Law 63
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on March 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-13 - Public Law 63
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Operating while intoxicated. Removes the minimum age requirement for a person to be convicted of operating a vehicle while intoxicated causing death, and specifies that the defense to certain operating while intoxicated offenses involving the use of a controlled substance only applies if the defendant consumed the controlled substance in accordance with a valid prescription.
Title
Operating while intoxicated. Removes the minimum age requirement for a person to be convicted of operating a vehicle while intoxicated causing death, and specifies that the defense to certain operating while intoxicated offenses involving the use of a controlled substance only applies if the defendant consumed the controlled substance in accordance with a valid prescription.
Sponsors
Sen. Eric Koch [R] | Sen. Aaron Freeman [R] | Sen. Greg Taylor [D] | Rep. Thomas Washburne [R] |
Rep. John Young [R] | Rep. Jack Jordan [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-27 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-13 | Senate | Public Law 63 |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2018-03-08 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2018-02-28 | House | Returned to the Senate without amendments |
2018-02-27 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 254: yeas 93, nays 0 |
2018-02-26 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2018-02-22 | House | Representative Jordan added as cosponsor |
2018-02-22 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2018-02-12 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Cosponsor: Representative Young J |
2018-02-06 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Washburne |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 191: yeas 47, nays 0 |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Senator Taylor G added as coauthor |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Senator Freeman added as second author |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Koch) prevailed; voice vote |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2018-01-08 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Corrections and Criminal Law |
2018-01-08 | Senate | Authored by Senator Koch |