IN SB0404 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-25 - Public Law 173
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Abortion, child abuse, and human trafficking. Defines "parent or legal guardian or custodian". Prohibits the state or an agency of the state from consenting to the abortion of a pregnant minor unless the life or health of the pregnant minor is endangered. Specifies that before performing an abortion on an unemancipated pregnant minor, a physician must first obtain from a parent, legal guardian, or custodian accompanying the unemancipated pregnant minor seeking an abortion: (1) written consent; (2) proof of identification; and (3) evidence of the relationship between the parent, legal guardian, or custodian and the unemancipated minor. Adds a parental

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Abortion, child abuse, and human trafficking. Defines "parent or legal guardian or custodian". Prohibits the state or an agency of the state from consenting to the abortion of a pregnant minor unless the life or health of the pregnant minor is endangered. Specifies that before performing an abortion on an unemancipated pregnant minor, a physician must first obtain from a parent, legal guardian, or custodian accompanying the unemancipated pregnant minor seeking an abortion: (1) written consent; (2) proof of identification; and (3) evidence of the relationship between the parent, legal guardian, or custodian and the unemancipated minor. Adds a parental

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-12 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House Amendments (Y: 31 N: 10 NV: 8 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 75 N: 23 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 36 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-25SenatePublic Law 173
2017-04-25SenateSigned by the Governor
2017-04-25SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2017-04-19HouseSigned by the Speaker
2017-04-17SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2017-04-12SenateSenate concurred in House Amendments; Roll Call 463: yeas 31, nays 10
2017-04-10SenateMotion to concur filed
2017-04-05HouseReturned to the Senate with amendments
2017-04-04HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 365: yeas 75, nays 23
2017-04-03HouseRepresentative Bacon added as cosponsor
2017-04-03HouseCall withdrawn
2017-03-30HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2017-03-28HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2017-03-07HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Public Policy
2017-03-01SenateReferred to the House
2017-02-28SenateSenator Kruse added as coauthor
2017-02-28SenateCosponsor: Representative Washburne
2017-02-28SenateHouse sponsor: Representative Mayfield
2017-02-28SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 231: yeas 36, nays 13
2017-02-27SenateSenator Doriot added as coauthor
2017-02-27SenateAmendment #2 (Breaux) motion withdrawn
2017-02-27SenateAmendment #1 (Breaux) failed; voice vote
2017-02-27SenateAmendment #3 (Houchin) prevailed; voice vote
2017-02-27SenateSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2017-02-23SenateSenator Young M added as coauthor
2017-02-23SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2017-01-26SenateSenator Zay added as coauthor
2017-01-24SenateSenator Crane added as coauthor
2017-01-17SenateSenator Raatz added as third author
2017-01-17SenateSenator Holdman added as second author
2017-01-10SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
2017-01-10SenateAuthored by Senator Houchin

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2017/bills/senate/404/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/a/8/0/4a801e4a/SB0404.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/4/5/b/645b7c4e/SB0404.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/e/f/b/7efb36be/SB0404.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/b/6/4/0b64122d/SB0404.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/9/a/4/e9a46dab/SB0404.03.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/a/7/1/2a710626/SB0404.03.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/2/c/1/e2c1fddd/SB0404.04.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/c/8/a/2c8ac1fa/SB0404.04.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/6/0/8/b60839a7/SB0404.05.ENRH.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/f/7/e/9f7e7ce9/SB0404.01.INTR.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/5/3/c/d53c4986/SB0404.231.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/d/f/2/fdf2f72e/SB0404.03.ENGS.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/9/9/b/299bfa9f/SB0404.365.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/f/c/0/3fc04db8/SB0404.463.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback