IN SB0400 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 11-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-12 - First reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code
Pending: House Courts and Criminal Code Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-12 - First reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code
Pending: House Courts and Criminal Code Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Aid in enforcing unconstitutional laws.
Title
Aid in enforcing unconstitutional laws.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-21 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 31 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-12 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Cosponsors: Reps. Koch, Speedy and Washburne |
2013-02-21 | Senate | House sponsor: Rep. McMillin |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 171: yeas 31 and nays 17 |
2013-02-18 | Senate | Senator Delph added as coauthor |
2013-02-18 | Senate | Amendment 1 (Steele), prevailed; voice vote |
2013-02-18 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Senators Steele and Boots added as coauthors |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Senators Smith, Tomes and Stoops added as coauthors |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Senator M. Young added as second author |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Senator Tomes removed as second author |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Senators Schneider, Waterman and Yoder added as coauthors |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Senator Tomes added as second author |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Senator Kruse added as coauthor |
2013-01-10 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Corrections & Criminal Law |
2013-01-10 | Senate | Authored by Senator Banks |