IN SB0398 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-07 - Public Law 30
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-07 - Public Law 30
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Bone marrow donor recruitment program. Allows the state department of health to establish a bone marrow donor recruitment program and post information on the state department's Internet web site to provide education to Indiana residents concerning bone marrow donation. Allows certain entities to disseminate the informational materials.
Title
Bone marrow donor recruitment program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-22 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 92 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-26 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-26 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-07 | Senate | Public Law 30 |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2022-03-01 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2022-02-23 | House | Returned to the Senate without amendments |
2022-02-22 | House | Representatives Lehman, Shackleford, Summers added as cosponsors |
2022-02-22 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 244: yeas 92, nays 1 |
2022-02-21 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2022-02-17 | House | Representatives Shackleford and Summers removed as cosponsors |
2022-02-17 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2022-02-08 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Public Health |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as coauthor |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Cosponsors: Representatives Shackleford and Summers |
2022-02-01 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Vermilion |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 188: yeas 49, nays 0 |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Senators Becker, Brown L, Busch, Crider, Donato, Leising, Melton, Yoder added as coauthors |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2022-01-13 | Senate | Senator Charbonneau added as second author |
2022-01-12 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services |
2022-01-12 | Senate | Authored by Senator Taylor G |