IN SB0397 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 7 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-12 - First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 7 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-12 - First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Community mental health centers. Specifies the funding amounts that must be provided by counties to community mental health centers. Provides that a county's maximum funding amount for a year is equal to the maximum funding amount for the previous year multiplied by the percentage change in the county's general fund property tax levy, after subtracting circuit breaker credits (but provides that the maximum funding amount will not be less than the preceding year's maximum funding amount). Phases-in this change in the case of Marion County. Requires the department of local government finance (DLGF) to verify the maximum appropriation calculation as
Title
Community mental health centers. Specifies the funding amounts that must be provided by counties to community mental health centers. Provides that a county's maximum funding amount for a year is equal to the maximum funding amount for the previous year multiplied by the percentage change in the county's general fund property tax levy, after subtracting circuit breaker credits (but provides that the maximum funding amount will not be less than the preceding year's maximum funding amount). Phases-in this change in the case of Marion County. Requires the department of local government finance (DLGF) to verify the maximum appropriation calculation as
Sponsors
Sen. Philip Boots [R] | Sen. Eric Koch [R] | Sen. Aaron Freeman [R] | Sen. Michael Crider [R] |
Rep. Donna Schaibley [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-06 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-17 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-17 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-12 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2018-02-06 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Schaibley |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 187: yeas 46, nays 1 |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Boots) prevailed; voice vote |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Senator Crider added as coauthor |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Senator Freeman added as coauthor |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Senator Koch added as second author |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Tax and Fiscal Policy |
2018-01-08 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Local Government |
2018-01-08 | Senate | Authored by Senator Boots |