IN SB0396 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-3)
Status: Passed on March 26 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-26 - Effective retroactive to 01/01/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-3)
Status: Passed on March 26 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-26 - Effective retroactive to 01/01/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the department of local government finance to use an adjusted six year average that eliminates the highest value determined for the six year period when making the annual calculation of the base rate for the assessment of agricultural land.
Title
Assessment of agricultural land.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-26 | Effective retroactive to 01/01/2010 | |
2010-03-26 | Public Law 112 | |
2010-03-25 | Signed by the Governor | |
2010-03-19 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2010-03-18 | Signed by the Speaker | |
2010-03-17 | Signed by the President Pro Tempore | |
2010-03-13 | Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 306: Yeas 50, Nays 0 | |
2010-03-08 | Senator Kruse added as coauthor | |
2010-03-04 | Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the House; Roll Call 312: Yeas 97, Nays 1 | |
2010-03-04 | Rules suspended | |
2010-03-04 | Conference committee report 1 : filed in the House | |
2010-02-25 | House advisors appointed: Pearson, DeLaney, Reske, Cherry and Borror | |
2010-02-25 | House conferees appointed: Grubb and Friend | |
2010-02-25 | Senate advisors appointed: Hershman, Charbonneau, Stutzman, Tallian and Lewis | |
2010-02-25 | Senate conferee appointed: Kenley and Hume | |
2010-02-25 | Senate dissented from House amendments | |
2010-02-24 | Returned to the Senate with amendments | |
2010-02-24 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 213: Yeas 99, Nays 0 | |
2010-02-23 | Amendment 8 (Battles), prevailed; Voice Vote | |
2010-02-23 | Amendment 4 (Kersey), prevailed; Roll Call 207: Yeas 78, Nays 18 | |
2010-02-23 | Amendment 11 (Stilwell), prevailed; Voice Vote | |
2010-02-23 | Amendment 5 (DeLaney), prevailed; Voice Vote | |
2010-02-23 | Amendment 7 (DeLaney), ruled out of order | |
2010-02-23 | Amendment 9 (Welch), prevailed; Roll Call 206: Yeas 96, Nays 1 | |
2010-02-23 | Amendment 6 (Herrell), prevailed; Roll Call 205: Yeas 67, Nays 26 | |
2010-02-23 | Amendment 10 (Pearson), prevailed; Roll Call 204: Yeas 93, Nays 0 | |
2010-02-23 | Amendment 3 (Reske), prevailed; Roll Call 203: Yeas 92, Nays 4 | |
2010-02-23 | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed | |
2010-02-18 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | |
2010-02-11 | Representatives Ruppel and Pearson added as cosponsors | |
2010-02-09 | First reading: referred to Committee on Agriculture and Rural Development | |
2010-02-02 | Senator R. Young added as coauthor | |
2010-02-02 | Senators Holdman and Head added as coauthors | |
2010-02-02 | Senator Hume added as coauthor | |
2010-02-02 | Senator Lewis added as coauthor | |
2010-02-02 | Senators Delph and Leising added as coauthors | |
2010-02-02 | Cosponsor: Rep. Friend | |
2010-02-02 | House sponsor: Rep. Grubb | |
2010-02-02 | Referred to the House | |
2010-02-02 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 160: Yeas 50 and Nays 0 | |
2010-02-01 | Senator Charbonneau added as coauthor | |
2010-02-01 | Senator Steele added as coauthor | |
2010-02-01 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | |
2010-01-28 | Committee report: do pass, adopted | |
2010-01-26 | Senator Stutzman added as coauthor | |
2010-01-14 | First reading: referred to Committee on Tax and Fiscal Policy | |
2010-01-14 | Authored by Senators Kenley and Hershman |