IN SB0395 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-18 - Public Law 85
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-18 - Public Law 85
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Uniform Consumer Credit Code. Amends the Uniform Consumer Credit Code (UCCC) as follows: (1) Changes: (A) from July 1 of each even-numbered year to January 1 of each odd-numbered year the effective date for the adjustment, based on changes in the Consumer Price Index, of various dollar amounts set forth in the UCCC; and (B) the corresponding date that precedes the adjustment date and by which the department of financial institutions (department) must issue an emergency rule announcing the adjustment. (2) For an agreement for a consumer credit sale entered into after June 30, 2020: (A) authorizes a seller to contract for and receive a nonrefundable prepaid finance charge based on the amount financed, in addition to the credit service charge and any other authorized charges and fees; and (B) prohibits precomputed consumer credit sales. (3) Repeals a provision concerning the credit service charge for revolving charge accounts and relocates the language to the provision concerning the authorized credit service charge for consumer sales. (4) For an agreement for a consumer loan entered into after June 30, 2020: (A) changes the amount of the authorized nonrefundable prepaid finance charge from $50 to an amount that is not more than: (i) $75; (ii) $150; or (iii) $200; based on the amount financed, in the case of a consumer loan not secured by an interest in land; and (B) prohibits precomputed consumer loans. Makes conforming changes with respect to supervised loans. Changes from $1.50 to $3 the amount of the fee that a lessor in a rental purchase agreement may impose for accepting rental payments by telephone. Makes conforming technical amendments throughout the UCCC to reflect the bill's changes.
Title
Uniform Consumer Credit Code.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-10 - Senate - Senate - Rules Suspended. Senate concurred in House amendments (Y: 40 N: 7 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 77 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 40 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 77 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 40 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-18 | Senate | Public Law 85 |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2020-03-16 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Rules Suspended. Senate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 355: yeas 40, nays 7 |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Motion to concur filed |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Dissent rescinded |
2020-03-09 | House | House advisors appointed: Heaton, Lehman, VanNatter, Chyung and Shackleford |
2020-03-09 | House | House conferees appointed: Burton and Hamilton |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Senate advisors appointed: Ruckelshaus and Ford J.D. |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Senate conferees appointed: Bassler and Breaux |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Senate dissented from House amendments |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Motion to dissent filed |
2020-03-04 | House | Returned to the Senate with amendments |
2020-03-03 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 295: yeas 77, nays 17 |
2020-03-02 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2020-02-25 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2020-02-11 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Financial Institutions |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2020-02-04 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Burton |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 178: yeas 40, nays 9 |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Senator Ruckelshaus added as second author |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2020-01-14 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Insurance and Financial Institutions |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Authored by Senator Bassler |