IN SB0395 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 6 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-16 - House Advisors appointed: Davisson, Thompson and Riecken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Historic hotel preservation and maintenance fund. Provides that $1,000,000 is appropriated from the West Baden Springs historic hotel preservation and maintenance fund (fund) for the period from May 1, 2015, through June 30, 2016, and in each state fiscal year beginning after June 30, 2016, and ending before July 1, 2020, for purposes of reimbursing claims made for expenditures to maintain a qualified historic hotel, the grounds surrounding the hotel, supporting buildings and structures related to the hotel, and other facilities used by the guests of the hotel. (Under current law, only the interest accruing to the fund is annually

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Historic hotel preservation and maintenance fund. Provides that $1,000,000 is appropriated from the West Baden Springs historic hotel preservation and maintenance fund (fund) for the period from May 1, 2015, through June 30, 2016, and in each state fiscal year beginning after June 30, 2016, and ending before July 1, 2020, for purposes of reimbursing claims made for expenditures to maintain a qualified historic hotel, the grounds surrounding the hotel, supporting buildings and structures related to the hotel, and other facilities used by the guests of the hotel. (Under current law, only the interest accruing to the fund is annually

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-04-02 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-03-25 - House - House Committee on Ways and Means - Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 47 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - Senate - Senate Committee on Tax & Fiscal Policy - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-04-16HouseHouse Advisors appointed: Davisson, Thompson and Riecken
2015-04-16HouseHouse Conferees appointed: Arnold L and Stemler
2015-04-14SenateSenate Advisors appointed: Kenley, Mrvan, Steele and Messmer
2015-04-14SenateSenate Conferees appointed: Houchin and Breaux
2015-04-14SenateSenate dissented from House amendments
2015-04-14SenateMotion to dissent filed
2015-04-06HouseReturned to the Senate with amendments
2015-04-02HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 366: yeas 90, nays 0
2015-03-30HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2015-03-26HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2015-03-03HouseFirst Reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means
2015-02-19SenateReferred to the House
2015-02-17SenateSenator Charbonneau added as coauthor
2015-02-17SenateSenators Steele and Eckerty added as coauthor
2015-02-17SenateRepresentative Davisson added as cosponsor
2015-02-17SenateSenator Kenley added as third author
2015-02-17SenateRepresentative Arnold added as sponsor
2015-02-17SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 171: yeas 47, nays 3
2015-02-16SenateSenator Messmer added as second author
2015-02-16SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2015-02-12SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2015-01-12SenateFirst Reading: referred to Committee on Tax & Fiscal Policy
2015-01-12SenateAuthored by Senator Houchin

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback