IN SB0394 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Passed on April 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-23 - Public Law 52
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Reporting of government malfeasance. Provides for confidentiality and relief for an individual who reports certain suspected violations of law by local public officers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Reporting of government malfeasance. Provides for confidentiality and relief for an individual who reports certain suspected violations of law by local public officers.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-03-31 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-24 - House - House Committee on Government and Regulatory Reform - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - Senate - Senate Committee on Judiciary - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-04-23SenatePublic Law 52
2015-04-23SenateSigned by the Governor
2015-04-20SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2015-04-13HouseSigned by the Speaker
2015-04-09SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2015-04-01HouseReturned to the Senate without amendments
2015-03-31HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 356: yeas 97, nays 0
2015-03-26HouseRepresentative Bartlett added as cosponsor
2015-03-26HouseRule 105.1 suspended
2015-03-26HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2015-03-24HouseCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2015-03-03HouseFirst Reading: referred to Committee on Government and Regulatory Reform
2015-02-19SenateReferred to the House
2015-02-17SenateRepresentatives Soliday, Olthoff, Slager added as cosponsors
2015-02-17SenateRepresentative McMillin added as sponsor
2015-02-17SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 170: yeas 50, nays 0
2015-02-16SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2015-02-12SenateSenator Randolph added as coauthor
2015-02-12SenateSenator Broden added as third author
2015-02-12SenateSenator Steele added as second author
2015-02-12SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2015-01-12SenateFirst Reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
2015-01-12SenateAuthored by Senator Charbonneau

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2015/bills/senate/394/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/3/4/c/934cfc21/SB0394.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/9/0/e/d90e4b39/SB0394.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/d/a/e/0dae22a2/SB0394.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/9/f/2/79f217c5/SB0394.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/6/5/f/e65fa938/SB0394.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/b/5/3/9b5318a7/SB0394.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/c/8/c/bc8c8fea/SB0394.04.ENRS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/d/a/6/8da6dea8/SB0394.01.INTR.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/c/0/e/9c0e70d9/SB0394.170.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/3/5/9/c359afe7/SB0394.02.COMS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/7/a/0/37a085b6/SB0394.356.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback