IN SB0393 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-08 - First reading: referred to Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance
Pending: House Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-08 - First reading: referred to Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance
Pending: House Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Insurance pooling for political subdivisions. Permits political subdivisions, acting jointly, to pool resources to purchase insurance coverage.
Title
Insurance pooling for political subdivisions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-01 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-20 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-20 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-08 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Senator Raatz added as coauthor |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Senator Boehnlein added as coauthor |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Cosponsors: Representatives O'Brien T and Ledbetter C |
2022-02-01 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Negele |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 132: yeas 48, nays 1 |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Senator Tomes added as coauthor |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Senator Pol added as coauthor |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Senator Niemeyer added as second author |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Senator Bohacek added as coauthor |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2022-01-11 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Local Government |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Authored by Senator Becker |