IN SB0392 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Passed on April 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-29 - Public Law 161
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Marion County zoning. Adds provisions that do the following: (1) Provide that the legislative body and the board of zoning appeals (BZA) of Lawrence, Speedway, Southport, and Beech Grove in Marion County (excluded city) have exclusive territorial jurisdiction within the excluded city's boundaries. (2) Require (rather than allow) the excluded city legislative body to conduct a hearing, acting as the plan commission, on a proposed zone map amendment affecting property within the excluded city. Provides that the excluded city legislative body (instead of the consolidated city and county legislative body) makes the decision regarding the zone map amendment. (3) Allow a member of the excluded city legislative body to appeal a decision of the BZA to the excluded city legislative body. (4) Provide that the excluded city legislative body's decision on the appeal is subject to judicial review. Requires all townships to be represented across all the divisions of the board of zoning appeals. Provides that not more than two members appointed to each division of the board of zoning appeals may be residents of the same township. Requires the appointing authority to consult with the township executive regarding the appointments. Requires appeals and applications for variances, special exceptions, special uses, contingent uses, and conditional uses to be allocated to a division of the board of zoning appeals that has at least one member who is a resident of a township in which the property is located that is the subject of the appeal or application.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Marion County zoning.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-20 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments (Y: 44 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 46 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-29SenatePublic Law 161
2021-04-29SenateSigned by the Governor
2021-04-28SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2021-04-28HouseSigned by the Speaker
2021-04-23SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2021-04-20SenateSenate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 457: yeas 44, nays 4
2021-04-09SenateMotion to concur filed
2021-04-09HouseReturned to the Senate with amendments
2021-04-08HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 378: yeas 87, nays 0
2021-04-06HouseAmendment #2 (Behning) prevailed; voice vote
2021-04-06HouseSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2021-03-25HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2021-03-22HouseRepresentative Miller added as cosponsor
2021-03-04HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Government and Regulatory Reform
2021-02-23SenateReferred to the House
2021-02-22SenateSenator Taylor G added as coauthor
2021-02-22SenateCosponsors: Representatives Jeter C and Speedy
2021-02-22SenateHouse sponsor: Representative Behning
2021-02-22SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 163: yeas 46, nays 3
2021-02-18SenateAmendment #3 (Young M) prevailed; voice vote
2021-02-18SenateSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2021-02-09SenateCommittee report: without recommendation, adopted
2021-02-09SenatePursuant to Senate Rule 68(b); reassigned to Committee on Rules and Legislative Procedure
2021-02-08SenateCommittee report: amend do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Appropriations
2021-01-14SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Local Government
2021-01-14SenateCoauthored by Senators Sandlin and Crider
2021-01-14SenateAuthored by Senators Young M, Freeman, Walker K

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2021/bills/senate/392/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/9/2/b/b92ba2d1/SB0392.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/d/2/9/ad29fa23/SB0392.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/3/7/e/837e96f6/SB0392.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/9/2/2/e922d1ac/SB0392.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/2/0/b/d20b5771/SB0392.04.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/c/8/5/ec8516d1/SB0392.04.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/b/1/c/2b1c2e23/SB0392.05.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/0/9/1/60912301/SB0392.05.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/9/9/3/69930ca3/SB0392.06.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/8/3/5/d8358495/SB0392.06.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/6/1/3/3613035e/SB0392.07.ENRH.pdf
Amendmenthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/6/9/4/d694709a/SB0392.03.COMS.AMS001.pdf
Amendmenthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/8/7/2/38723121/SB0392.03.COMS.AMS002.pdf
Amendmenthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/5/b/6/65b635d9/SB0392.03.COMS.AMS003.pdf
Amendmenthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/2/4/2/7242b8ee/SB0392.05.COMH.AMH001.pdf
Amendmenthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/9/1/3/7913cbb2/SB0392.05.COMH.AMH002.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/c/e/1/ace1f21a/SB0392.01.INTR.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/2/e/f/92ef3c1f/SB0392.01.INTR.FN002.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/d/f/d/cdfdfcc6/SB0392.01.INTR.CRS001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/d/e/c/ddec9886/SB0392.02.COMS.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/f/8/d/5f8d660b/SB0392.03.COMS.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/4/1/3/74133e18/SB0392.04.ENGS.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/1/f/a/21fa8be8/SB0392.04.ENGS.FN002.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/9/c/4/39c4f5dc/SB0392.04.ENGS.CRH001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/b/7/6/9b7667f9/SB0392.05.COMH.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/1/a/0/91a067e7/SB0392.06.ENGH.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/f/6/7/6f67bb02/SB0392.06.ENGH.FN002.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/1/c/7/11c75233/SB0392.06.ENGH.CON01.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/c/5/a/2c5ab1e8/SB0392.07.ENRH.FN001.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/9/2/a/f92aa1e7/SB0392.01.INTR.04.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/a/1/1/8a1191e2/SB0392.163_S.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/7/c/1/f7c1642b/SB0392.04.ENGS.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/d/b/c/5dbc8c58/SB0392.378_H.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/1/6/d/916dc0bd/SB0392.457_S.pdf

Bill Comments 750

feedback