IN SB0392 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-3)
Status: Passed on May 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-05 - Public Law 227
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Medicare supplement and Medicaid study. Requires an insurer that makes a Medicare supplement policy available to an individual eligible for Medicare based on age to make at least one "Plan A" Medicare supplement policy available to an individual eligible for Medicare based on disability. Specifies enrollment and insurance producer compensation requirements that apply to the "Plan A" policy. Requires the Medicaid advisory committee to study and make recommendations before November 1, 2019, concerning Medicaid reimbursement and school based health centers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Medicare supplement and Medicaid study. Requires an insurer that makes a Medicare supplement policy available to an individual eligible for Medicare based on age to make at least one "Plan A" Medicare supplement policy available to an individual eligible for Medicare based on disability. Specifies enrollment and insurance producer compensation requirements that apply to the "Plan A" policy. Requires the Medicaid advisory committee to study and make recommendations before November 1, 2019, concerning Medicaid reimbursement and school based health centers.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-24 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Senate - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 83 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - House - Amendment #1 (DeLaney) failed (Y: 28 N: 61 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2019-04-11 - House - House - Amendment #4 (Carbaugh) prevailed (Y: 66 N: 25 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - Senate - Third reading (Y: 41 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-05SenatePublic Law 227
2019-05-05SenateSigned by the Governor
2019-04-30SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-04-29HouseSigned by the Speaker
2019-04-24SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2019-04-24HouseRules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 637: yeas 98, nays 0
2019-04-24SenateRules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 597: yeas 48, nays 1
2019-04-24HouseCCR # 1 filed in the House
2019-04-24SenateCCR # 1 filed in the Senate
2019-04-18HouseHouse advisors appointed: Stutzman, Lehman, Austin and Bauer
2019-04-18HouseHouse conferees appointed: Carbaugh and Shackleford
2019-04-18SenateSenate advisors appointed: Bassler, Ford J.D. and Zay
2019-04-18SenateSenate conferees appointed: Houchin and Breaux
2019-04-18SenateSenate dissented from House amendments
2019-04-17SenateMotion to dissent filed
2019-04-16HouseReturned to the Senate with amendments
2019-04-15HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 522: yeas 83, nays 0
2019-04-11HouseAmendment #2 (DeLaney) ruled out of order
2019-04-11HouseAmendment #5 (Clere) prevailed; voice vote
2019-04-11HouseAmendment #1 (DeLaney) failed; Roll Call 501: yeas 28, nays 61
2019-04-11HouseAmendment #4 (Carbaugh) prevailed; Roll Call 500: yeas 66, nays 25
2019-04-11HouseSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2019-04-10HouseRepresentative Shackleford added as cosponsor
2019-04-04HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2019-03-05HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Insurance
2019-02-27SenateReferred to the House
2019-02-26SenateHouse sponsor: Representative Carbaugh
2019-02-26SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 234: yeas 41, nays 8
2019-02-25SenateSenator Randolph added as coauthor
2019-02-25SenateSenator Bassler added as second author
2019-02-25SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2019-02-21SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2019-02-18SenateSenators Walker, Ruckelshaus, Sandlin, Bohacek, Zay, Ford J.D. added as coauthors
2019-01-14SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Insurance and Financial Institutions
2019-01-14SenateAuthored by Senator Houchin

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2019/bills/senate/392/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/b/0/4/5b0422f6/SB0392.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/2/f/8/d2f8a159/SB0392.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/b/0/1/3b017cf4/SB0392.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/6/a/a/e6aa2e9a/SB0392.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/7/6/c/276c5155/SB0392.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/9/b/6/49b631db/SB0392.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/0/8/0/408063a6/SB0392.04.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/9/4/8/49482fd9/SB0392.04.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/e/b/4/4eb440d9/SB0392.05.ENRH.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/6/5/a/b65a8b09/SB0392.01.INTR.02.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/4/2/f/242fad82/SB0392.234.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/7/f/a/47fa151c/SB0392.02.COMS.02.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/4/1/b/d41b5fcf/SB0392.500.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/5/9/e/f59e919e/SB0392.501.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/5/5/7/d557fdc5/SB0392.522.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/f/2/6/ef263659/SB0392.597.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/9/a/4/c9a47ff8/SB0392.637.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback