IN SB0390 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-06 - Public Law 274
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Education matters. Provides that if: (1) a school employee files a complaint that alleges that an exclusive representative or school employer has engaged in certain unfair practices; and (2) the Indiana education employment relations board determines that the exclusive representative or school employer engaged in the unfair practice; the board may assess a civil penalty of at least $500 but not more than $5,000 for each violation. Provides that, before a school employer and school employees may privately negotiate during the time period for formal collective bargaining, the parties must hold at least one public hearing and take public testimony. Requires the school employer to conduct a public meeting to discuss a tentative collective bargaining agreement at least 72 hours before it is ratified. Provides that notice of a public meeting and a tentative collective bargaining agreement must be posted on the school employer's Internet web site at least 72 hours before the public meeting. Provides that a school employer must allow for public comment at the meeting at which a tentative collective bargaining agreement is ratified.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Education matters. Provides that if: (1) a school employee files a complaint that alleges that an exclusive representative or school employer has engaged in certain unfair practices; and (2) the Indiana education employment relations board determines that the exclusive representative or school employer engaged in the unfair practice; the board may assess a civil penalty of at least $500 but not more than $5,000 for each violation. Provides that, before a school employer and school employees may privately negotiate during the time period for formal collective bargaining, the parties must hold at least one public hearing and take public testimony. Requires the school employer to conduct a public meeting to discuss a tentative collective bargaining agreement at least 72 hours before it is ratified. Provides that notice of a public meeting and a tentative collective bargaining agreement must be posted on the school employer's Internet web site at least 72 hours before the public meeting. Provides that a school employer must allow for public comment at the meeting at which a tentative collective bargaining agreement is ratified.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-24 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 62 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Senate - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 30 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - House Floor - (Y: 59 N: 33 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - House - House - Amendment #1 (DeLaney) failed (Y: 35 N: 59 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2019-04-10 - House - House Floor - (Y: 83 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - Senate - Third reading (Y: 33 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-06SenatePublic Law 274
2019-05-06SenateSigned by the Governor
2019-04-30SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-04-29HouseSigned by the Speaker
2019-04-24SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2019-04-24HouseRules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 619: yeas 62, nays 34
2019-04-23SenateRules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 583: yeas 30, nays 18
2019-04-23HouseCCR # 1 filed in the House
2019-04-23SenateCCR # 1 filed in the Senate
2019-04-23HouseRepresentative Judy added as conferee
2019-04-23HouseRepresentative DeLaney removed as conferee
2019-04-23SenateSenator Kruse added as conferee
2019-04-23SenateSenator Melton removed as conferee
2019-04-18HouseHouse advisors appointed: Behning, Clere, Cook, Klinker and Pfaff
2019-04-18HouseHouse conferees appointed: Goodrich and DeLaney
2019-04-18SenateSenate advisors appointed: Raatz, Stoops and Spartz
2019-04-18SenateSenate conferees appointed: Houchin and Melton
2019-04-18SenateSenate dissented from House amendments
2019-04-17SenateMotion to dissent filed
2019-04-12HouseReturned to the Senate with amendments
2019-04-11HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 498: yeas 58, nays 34
2019-04-10HouseAmendment #1 (DeLaney) failed; Roll Call 469: yeas 35, nays 59
2019-04-10HouseAmendment #2 (Clere) prevailed; Roll Call 468: yeas 83, nays 11
2019-04-10HouseSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2019-04-08HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2019-03-05HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Education
2019-02-27SenateReferred to the House
2019-02-26SenateCosponsor: Representative Huston
2019-02-26SenateHouse sponsor: Representative Goodrich
2019-02-26SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 233: yeas 33, nays 16
2019-02-25SenateAmendment #1 (Tomes) failed; Division of the Senate: yeas 15, nays 32
2019-02-25SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2019-02-21SenateCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2019-02-14SenateSenator Kruse added as coauthor
2019-02-12SenateSenator Raatz added as second author
2019-01-14SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Education and Career Development
2019-01-14SenateAuthored by Senator Houchin

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2019/bills/senate/390/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/7/f/7/27f7cd1c/SB0390.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/e/1/d/8e1d2359/SB0390.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/a/8/2/5a828ceb/SB0390.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/6/e/1/86e1badf/SB0390.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/1/7/5/5175793f/SB0390.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/e/8/d/8e8df733/SB0390.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/6/a/d/66ada405/SB0390.04.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/7/5/4/e7549a26/SB0390.04.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/7/3/0/c730debc/SB0390.05.ENRH.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/4/3/6/b4360d6d/SB0390.01.INTR.01.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/2/d/9/12d9347a/SB0390.233.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/6/c/0/66c0fbcf/SB0390.02.COMS.01.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/1/b/7/81b7f1df/SB0390.468.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/3/7/7/b37701ae/SB0390.469.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/3/f/1/93f1f597/SB0390.498.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/6/e/b/06eb9151/SB0390.583.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/6/c/e/c6ce3c7a/SB0390.619.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback