IN SB0389 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-07 - Representative Karickhoff added as cosponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-07 - Representative Karickhoff added as cosponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
County excise surtax and wheel tax.
Title
County excise surtax and wheel tax.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-01-29 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 37 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-07 | House | Representative Karickhoff added as cosponsor |
2013-03-07 | House | Representative Lehe added as sponsor |
2013-03-07 | House | Representative Karickhoff removed as sponsor |
2013-02-26 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2013-01-29 | Senate | Senator Skinner added as coauthor |
2013-01-29 | Senate | Senator Lanane added as coauthor |
2013-01-29 | Senate | House sponsor: Rep. Karickhoff |
2013-01-29 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2013-01-29 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 45: yeas 37 and nays 11 |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Senator Hershman added as second author |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2013-01-10 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Tax and Fiscal Policy |
2013-01-10 | Senate | Authored by Senator Boots |