IN SB0388 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-13 - Public Law 252
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-13 - Public Law 252
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that a voter casting, or waiting in line to cast, an early vote absentee ballot in person at: (1) a location of an office of the circuit court clerk designated by the circuit court clerk; (2) the office of a board of elections and registration; or (3) a satellite office; when the hour for closing the location or office, or the deadline for voting, occurs, shall be permitted to vote unless otherwise prevented according to law. Provides that an individual designated by the circuit court clerk at an early voting location shall: (1) determine the end of the line of voters who are waiting to vote at the time the hour for closing an early voting location occurs; and (2) use one of the following methods to identify the voters in the line who may vote unless otherwise prevented according to law: (A) writing down the name of each voter; (B) stamping each voter's hand; or (C) standing, or designating another individual to stand, immediately behind the last voter who may vote. Urges the legislative council to assign to the census data advisory committee the study of the election day voting process, including ways to ensure that every voter in line at the hour for closing the polls, and only those voters, may vote.
Title
Election matters.
Sponsors
Sen. Karen Tallian [D] | Sen. Patricia Miller [R] | Sen. Travis Holdman [R] | Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] |
Sen. Brent Steele [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-04-25 - House - House - Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the House (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-25 - Senate - Senate - Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-12 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-02-11 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-04-25 - Senate - Senate - Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-12 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-02-11 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-13 | House | Public Law 252 |
2013-05-11 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2013-04-26 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2013-04-26 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2013-04-25 | House | Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the House; Roll Call 602: yeas 98, nays 0 |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 526: yeas 50, nays 0 |
2013-04-25 | House | Rules suspended |
2013-04-09 | House | House advisors appointed: Richardson, C. Brown and Hale |
2013-04-09 | House | House conferees appointed: Smaltz and Battles |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Senate advisors appointed: Pete Miller, Lanane and Landske |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Senate conferee appointed: Holdman and Tallian |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Senate dissented from House amendments |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Concurrence withdrawn |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Motion to concur in House amendments filed |
2013-03-14 | House | Representative C. Brown added as cosponsor |
2013-03-14 | House | House Rule 105.1 suspended |
2013-03-12 | House | Returned to the Senate with amendments |
2013-03-12 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 262: yeas 97, nays 0 |
2013-03-11 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2013-03-11 | House | Representative Davis added as cosponsor |
2013-03-11 | House | House Rule 105.1 suspended |
2013-03-07 | House | Representatives Richardson and Battles added as cosponsors |
2013-03-07 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2013-02-26 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Elections and Apportionment |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Cosponsor: Rep. Hale |
2013-02-11 | Senate | House sponsor: Rep. Smaltz |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 96: yeas 48 and nays 0 |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as coauthor |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Senator Steele added as coauthor |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Senator Tallian added as third author |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Amendment 1 (Pete Miller), prevailed; voice vote |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2013-01-10 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Elections |
2013-01-10 | Senate | Authored by Senators Pete Miller and Holdman |