IN SB0386 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-28 - Public Law 232
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Property taxation. Makes procedural changes and technical corrections to various property tax provisions in the Indiana Code that relate to property tax assessments, reviews, appeals, and refunds. Provides for the exchange of information before a hearing to be held by a county property tax assessment board of appeals (PTABOA). Provides that property tax appeals must be filed not later than the following: (1) For assessments before January 1, 2019, the earlier of: (A) 45 days after the date on which the notice of assessment is mailed by the county; or (B) 45 days after the date on which the tax

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Property taxation. Makes procedural changes and technical corrections to various property tax provisions in the Indiana Code that relate to property tax assessments, reviews, appeals, and refunds. Provides for the exchange of information before a hearing to be held by a county property tax assessment board of appeals (PTABOA). Provides that property tax appeals must be filed not later than the following: (1) For assessments before January 1, 2019, the earlier of: (A) 45 days after the date on which the notice of assessment is mailed by the county; or (B) 45 days after the date on which the tax

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-21 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-21 - Senate - Senate - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-28SenatePublic Law 232
2017-04-28SenateSigned by the Governor
2017-04-27HouseSigned by the Speaker
2017-04-27SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2017-04-25SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2017-04-21HouseRules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 543: yeas 97, nays 0
2017-04-21SenateRules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 525: yeas 50, nays 0
2017-04-21HouseCCR # 1 filed in the House
2017-04-21SenateCCR # 1 filed in the Senate
2017-04-12HouseHouse advisors appointed: Aylesworth, Smith M, Leonard and Harris
2017-04-12SenateSenate advisors appointed: Bohacek, Breaux and Hershman
2017-04-12HouseHouse conferees appointed: Slager and Pryor
2017-04-12SenateSenate conferees appointed: Niemeyer and Niezgodski
2017-04-12SenateSenate dissented from House amendments
2017-04-11SenateMotion to dissent filed
2017-03-29HouseReturned to the Senate with amendments
2017-03-28HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 327: yeas 94, nays 0
2017-03-27HouseAmendment #3 (Slager) prevailed; voice vote
2017-03-27HouseSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2017-03-23HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2017-02-28HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means
2017-02-10SenateReferred to the House
2017-02-09SenateCosponsor: Representative Aylesworth
2017-02-09SenateHouse sponsor: Representative Slager
2017-02-09SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 85: yeas 47, nays 0
2017-02-07SenateSenator Bohacek added as second author
2017-02-07SenateAmendment #1 (Niemeyer) prevailed; voice vote
2017-02-07SenateSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2017-02-06SenateSenator Randolph added as coauthor
2017-02-02SenateCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2017-01-10SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Local Government
2017-01-10SenateAuthored by Senator Niemeyer

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2017/bills/senate/386/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/0/2/d/a02d9a9a/SB0386.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/5/3/4/053456c8/SB0386.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/5/9/f/859f96ed/SB0386.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/6/2/4/062459aa/SB0386.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/2/f/3/e2f38252/SB0386.03.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/9/8/9/d989f7c5/SB0386.03.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/8/5/e/585ee156/SB0386.04.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/b/d/f/abdf1f3b/SB0386.04.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/b/d/8/abd841b1/SB0386.05.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/f/0/c/6f0cc3fe/SB0386.05.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/d/2/4/2d240f49/SB0386.06.ENRH.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/3/8/b/438bb68a/SB0386.01.INTR.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/d/4/5/4d45c68d/SB0386.85.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/0/f/b/f0fb5690/SB0386.03.ENGS.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/0/f/e/30fe1097/SB0386.327.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/2/f/2/62f2f347/SB0386.525.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/c/f/f/ccffa933/SB0386.543.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback