IN SB0385 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on April 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-01 - Public Law 11
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on April 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-01 - Public Law 11
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Additional professional sports development area. Provides that an additional professional sports development area in Marion County must be established before July 1, 2024 (instead of July 1, 2022). Provides that taxes may not be collected in the additional professional sports development area until after the earlier of: (1) certain conditions having been met; or (2) June 30, 2023 (instead of June 30, 2021).
Title
Additional professional sports development area.
Sponsors
Sen. Jack Sandlin [R] | Sen. Jon Ford [R] | Sen. Aaron Freeman [R] | Sen. Ed Charbonneau [R] |
Sen. David Niezgodski [D] | Rep. Mike Speedy [R] | Rep. Carey Hamilton [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-18 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 83 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-01 | Senate | Public Law 11 |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2021-03-23 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2021-03-19 | House | Returned to the Senate without amendments |
2021-03-18 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 275: yeas 83, nays 6 |
2021-03-16 | House | Representative Speedy added as sponsor |
2021-03-16 | House | Representative Sullivan removed as sponsor |
2021-03-16 | House | Representative Speedy removed as cosponsor |
2021-03-15 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2021-03-11 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2021-03-02 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Senators Charbonneau and Niezgodski added as coauthors |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Senator Freeman added as third author |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Senator Ford Jon added as second author |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Cosponsors: Representatives Speedy and Hamilton |
2021-02-02 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Sullivan |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 61: yeas 45, nays 0 |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2021-01-14 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2021-01-14 | Senate | Authored by Senator Sandlin |