IN SB0385 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 24 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-24 - Public Law 64
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 24 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-24 - Public Law 64
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Changes election law as follows: (1) Permits the election division to provide voter registration information from the statewide voter registration system (system) without charge to the clerks of the United States District Courts for the Northern and Southern Districts of Indiana. (2) Amends online voter registration procedures. (3) Provides that an individual who knowingly making a false statement about a voter identification number on a poll list commits a Level 6 felony. (4) Permits a county voter registration office to provide precinct inspectors a scanned copy of a more recent signature of a voter than the signature on the voter's original registration. (5) Exempts precinct officials, a county voter registration office, and various other agencies taking custody of voter registration forms from "chain of custody" documentation. (6) Specifies efforts officials must make to obtain information missing on voter registration forms. (7) Permits a county voter registration office to send an address confirmation notice to an active voter who may no longer reside at the address shown on the voter's registration record if the county sends a similar notice to voters when a boundary or polling place is changed. (8) Sets requirements for mailings for the statewide voter registration residency confirmation outreach project. (9) Provides a method for a voter to update information in the voter's registration record in a county using electronic poll books. (10) Requires officials to request information from various public sources to update voter registration records. (11) Provides that a family and social services administration office (FSSA) providing Medicaid services has the same deadlines to transmit voter registration applications as other FSSA offices. (12) Specifies how a
Title
Various election law matters.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-13 - Senate - Senate - Motion to Concur in House Amendments (Y: 35 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - House - House Floor - (Y: 66 N: 29 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - House - House Floor - (Y: 32 N: 65 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2014-02-24 - House - House Floor - (Y: 31 N: 66 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2014-02-19 - House - House Committee on Elections and Apportionment - Roll Call 038503 (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-04 - Senate - Senate Floor - (Y: 36 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-01-24 - Senate - Senate Committee on Elections - Roll Call 038501 (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - House - House Floor - (Y: 66 N: 29 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - House - House Floor - (Y: 32 N: 65 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2014-02-24 - House - House Floor - (Y: 31 N: 66 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2014-02-19 - House - House Committee on Elections and Apportionment - Roll Call 038503 (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-04 - Senate - Senate Floor - (Y: 36 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-01-24 - Senate - Senate Committee on Elections - Roll Call 038501 (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-24 | Senate | Public Law 64 |
2014-03-24 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2014-03-15 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Rules Suspended. Motion to Concur in House Amendments: prevailed; Roll Call 441: yeas 35 and nays 11 |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Motion to withdraw dissent: prevailed |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Motion to Rescind Dissent: prevailed |
2014-03-11 | House | Representative C. Brown added as advisor |
2014-03-11 | House | Representative Battles added as advisor |
2014-03-11 | House | Representative Cox added as advisor |
2014-03-11 | House | Representative Sullivan added as advisor |
2014-03-11 | House | Representative Slager added as advisor |
2014-03-11 | House | Representative Bartlett added as conferee |
2014-03-11 | House | Representative Richardson added as conferee |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Senator Walker added as advisor |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Senator Tallian added as advisor |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Senator Pat Miller added as advisor |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Senator Arnold added as conferee |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Senator Pete Miller added as conferee |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Senate dissented from House amendments |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Motion to Withdraw Concurrence: prevailed |
2014-02-25 | House | Returned to the Senate with amendments |
2014-02-25 | House | Third reading: Passed: Roll Call 285: yeas 66 and nays 29 |
2014-02-24 | House | Second reading: engrossed. |
2014-02-24 | House | SB 385 Amendment #2 (Battles), failed. |
2014-02-24 | House | SB 385 Amendment #3 (Bartlett), failed. |
2014-02-24 | House | SB 385 Amendment #1 (Battles) motion withdrawn. |
2014-02-20 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted. |
2014-02-10 | House | First Reading: Referred to Elections and Apportionment |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Representative Richardson added sponsor. |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Third reading: Passed: Roll Call 189: yeas 36 and nays 12 |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2014-02-03 | Senate | SB 385 Amendment #1 (Miller, Pete), prevailed. |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Senator Arnold added as coauthor. |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Senator Pat Miller added as second author. |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Committee report: do pass amend, adopted. |
2014-01-14 | Senate | First Reading: Referred to Elections |
2014-01-14 | Senate | Authored by Senator Pete Miller. |