IN SB0384 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-25 - Effective 07/01/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-25 - Effective 07/01/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the regulatory flexibility committee to study cloud computing and report to the general assembly by November 1, 2011.
Title
Cloud computing security.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-25 | Effective 07/01/2010 | |
2010-03-25 | Public Law 37 | |
2010-03-12 | Signed by the Governor | |
2010-03-11 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2010-03-08 | Signed by the Speaker | |
2010-03-03 | Signed by the President Pro Tempore | |
2010-02-25 | Returned to the Senate without amendments | |
2010-02-25 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 256: Yeas 97, Nays 0 | |
2010-02-24 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | |
2010-02-22 | Committee report: do pass, adopted | |
2010-02-09 | First reading: referred to Committee on Commerce, Energy, Technology and Utilities | |
2010-02-02 | House sponsor: Rep. Moses | |
2010-02-02 | Referred to the House | |
2010-02-02 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 156: Yeas 48 and Nays 2 | |
2010-01-28 | Senator Holdman added as second author | |
2010-01-28 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | |
2010-01-28 | Senator Breaux added as coauthor | |
2010-01-25 | Committee report: do pass, adopted | |
2010-01-12 | First reading: referred to Committee on Utilities & Technology | |
2010-01-12 | Authored by Senator Merritt |