IN SB0381 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Public Law 33
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Public Law 33
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Cemetery perpetual care fund distributions. Provides that a cemetery perpetual care fund that is a trust may be converted into a total return unitrust (a trust from which the trustee pays out an amount computed as a percentage of the fair market value of the trust assets instead of paying out the income of the trust). Provides that the percentage used to compute the amount paid out from a perpetual care fund converted into a total return unitrust must: (1) represent a reasonable current return from the trust; (2) be agreed upon in writing by the trustee and the owner of the cemetery or ordered by the court having jurisdiction of the trust; (3) serve the purpose of the perpetual care of the cemetery; and (4) be not less than 3% or more than 5%. Prevents certain distributions from being made from a total return unitrust in certain instances. Provides that, except for withdrawals for the payment of expenses, all withdrawals from a trust converted into a total return unitrust must be devoted to the perpetual care of the cemetery, including the immediate maintenance needs of the cemetery.
Title
Cemetery perpetual care fund distributions. Provides that a cemetery perpetual care fund that is a trust may be converted into a total return unitrust (a trust from which the trustee pays out an amount computed as a percentage of the fair market value of the trust assets instead of paying out the income of the trust). Provides that the percentage used to compute the amount paid out from a perpetual care fund converted into a total return unitrust must: (1) represent a reasonable current return from the trust; (2) be agreed upon in writing by the trustee and the owner of the cemetery or ordered by the court having jurisdiction of the trust; (3) serve the purpose of the perpetual care of the cemetery; and (4) be not less than 3% or more than 5%. Prevents certain distributions from being made from a total return unitrust in certain instances. Provides that, except for withdrawals for the payment of expenses, all withdrawals from a trust converted into a total return unitrust must be devoted to the perpetual care of the cemetery, including the immediate maintenance needs of the cemetery.
Sponsors
Sen. Eric Koch [R] | Sen. Randall Head [R] | Rep. Gerald Torr [R] | Rep. Chris May [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-01 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Third reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Third reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-18 | Senate | Public Law 33 |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2019-04-08 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 364: yeas 46, nays 0 |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Motion to concur filed |
2019-03-15 | House | Returned to the Senate with amendments |
2019-03-14 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 312: yeas 90, nays 0 |
2019-03-11 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2019-03-04 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2019-02-26 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Cosponsor: Representative May |
2019-02-19 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Torr |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 159: yeas 40, nays 0 |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Senator Head added as second author |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2019-01-14 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Authored by Senator Koch |