IN SB0380 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Passed on April 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Public Law 68
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Supported decision making. Requires that a person who files a petition for the appointment of a guardian for an incapacitated person or minor must inform the court what less restrictive alternatives were considered or implemented and, if less restrictive alternatives were not considered or implemented, the reason for the failure to consider or implement less restrictive alternatives. Provides for the use of supported decision making agreements for adults who need support and accommodations in making, communicating, and effectuating decisions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Supported decision making. Requires that a person who files a petition for the appointment of a guardian for an incapacitated person or minor must inform the court what less restrictive alternatives were considered or implemented and, if less restrictive alternatives were not considered or implemented, the reason for the failure to consider or implement less restrictive alternatives. Provides for the use of supported decision making agreements for adults who need support and accommodations in making, communicating, and effectuating decisions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-25 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-24SenatePublic Law 68
2019-04-24SenateSigned by the Governor
2019-04-23SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-04-02HouseSigned by the Speaker
2019-03-28SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2019-03-26HouseReturned to the Senate without amendments
2019-03-25HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 341: yeas 96, nays 0
2019-03-21HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2019-03-19HouseRepresentative Cook added as cosponsor
2019-03-18HouseCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2019-03-05HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
2019-02-27SenateReferred to the House
2019-02-26SenateCosponsors: Representatives Torr and DeLaney
2019-02-26SenateHouse sponsor: Representative McNamara
2019-02-26SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 232: yeas 48, nays 0
2019-02-25SenateSenator Rogers added as coauthor
2019-02-25SenateSenator Bohacek added as coauthor
2019-02-25SenateSenator Head added as second author
2019-02-25SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2019-02-21SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2019-02-14SenateSenator Taylor G added as coauthor
2019-02-07SenateSenator Lanane added as coauthor
2019-01-14SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
2019-01-14SenateAuthored by Senator Koch

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2019/bills/senate/380/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/c/f/c/ccfcb6a5/SB0380.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/1/c/f/d1cf23e4/SB0380.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/f/a/1/6fa1a653/SB0380.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/e/4/9/9e496afd/SB0380.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/4/0/a/640a61ba/SB0380.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/3/4/7/a347d260/SB0380.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/a/7/1/9a71c4bf/SB0380.04.ENRH.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/f/d/f/efdff00a/SB0380.01.INTR.02.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/7/6/1/8761b63e/SB0380.232.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/2/b/d/62bd9c53/SB0380.02.COMS.03.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/9/e/b/09ebd29e/SB0380.341.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback