IN SB0380 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-5)
Status: Passed on May 4 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-04 - Public Law 115
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-5)
Status: Passed on May 4 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-04 - Public Law 115
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Crisis intervention teams. Requires the law enforcement training academy to include an overview of crisis intervention team (CIT) training model in initial training. Establishes the Indiana technical assistance center for crisis intervention teams to: (1) identify grants and other funds that may be used to fund CIT programs; (2) create and support a statewide CIT advisory committee; and (3) provide training, information, and technical assistance.
Title
Crisis intervention teams. Requires the law enforcement training academy to include an overview of crisis intervention team (CIT) training model in initial training. Establishes the Indiana technical assistance center for crisis intervention teams to: (1) identify grants and other funds that may be used to fund CIT programs; (2) create and support a statewide CIT advisory committee; and (3) provide training, information, and technical assistance.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-15 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House Amendments (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-07 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-24 - House - House Committee on Veterans Affairs and Public Safety - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - Senate - Senate Committee on Homeland Security & Transportation - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-04-07 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-24 - House - House Committee on Veterans Affairs and Public Safety - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - Senate - Senate Committee on Homeland Security & Transportation - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-04 | Senate | Public Law 115 |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2015-04-29 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 475: yeas 50, nays 0 |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Senator Alting added as coauthor |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Motion to concur filed |
2015-04-08 | House | Returned to the Senate with amendments |
2015-04-07 | House | Representative Carbaugh added as cosponsor |
2015-04-07 | House | Rule 105.1 suspended |
2015-04-07 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 377: yeas 96, nays 0 |
2015-04-02 | House | Amendment #1 (Slager) prevailed; voice vote |
2015-04-02 | House | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2015-03-26 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2015-03-24 | House | Representative Zent added as cosponsor |
2015-03-03 | House | First Reading: referred to Committee on Veterans Affairs and Public Safety |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Senator Miller, Pat added as coauthor |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Representatives Lawson and Forestal added as cosponsors |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Representative Slager added as sponsor |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 211: yeas 48, nays 1 |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Senators Randolph and Arnold added as coauthors |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Senator Yoder added as coauthor |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Senator Merritt added as third author |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Senator Young, M. added as coauthor |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Senator Crider added as second author |
2015-01-12 | Senate | First Reading: referred to Committee on Homeland Security & Transportation |
2015-01-12 | Senate | Authored by Senator Stoops |