IN SB0377 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-11 - Senator Busch added as second author
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Allen County substance abuse pilot program. Removes a requirement that the administrator of the Allen County substance abuse pilot program (pilot program) expend $1 of local funds for every $1 of state funds expended. Provides that the Allen County board of county commissioners and the administrator of the pilot program shall determine what is considered a room and board day for a recovery residency for the pilot program. Provides for a rate of $32.50 per room and board day for a recovery residency. Makes an appropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Allen County substance abuse pilot program. Removes a requirement that the administrator of the Allen County substance abuse pilot program (pilot program) expend $1 of local funds for every $1 of state funds expended. Provides that the Allen County board of county commissioners and the administrator of the pilot program shall determine what is considered a room and board day for a recovery residency for the pilot program. Provides for a rate of $32.50 per room and board day for a recovery residency. Makes an appropriation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-06 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-11SenateSenator Busch added as second author
2019-02-07SenateCommittee report: do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Appropriations
2019-01-14SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services
2019-01-14SenateAuthored by Senator Merritt

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback