IN SB0377 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-13 - Public Law 60
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-13 - Public Law 60
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Small loans. Allows the director of the department of financial institutions to take certain actions concerning the use of technology for oversight and enforcement of compliance with the law concerning small loans.
Title
Small loans. Allows the director of the department of financial institutions to take certain actions concerning the use of technology for oversight and enforcement of compliance with the law concerning small loans.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-27 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-18 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-18 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-13 | Senate | Public Law 60 |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2018-03-08 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2018-02-28 | House | Returned to the Senate without amendments |
2018-02-27 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 251: yeas 91, nays 0 |
2018-02-26 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2018-02-22 | House | Representative Ellington added as cosponsor |
2018-02-22 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2018-02-12 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Financial Institutions |
2018-02-02 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2018-02-01 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Burton |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 122: yeas 48, nays 0 |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Perfect) prevailed; voice vote |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Reread second time: amended, ordered engrossed |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Placed back on second reading |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Senator Holdman added as second author |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2018-01-08 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Insurance and Financial Institutions |
2018-01-08 | Senate | Authored by Senator Perfect |