IN SB0375 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-4)
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-09 - Representative Lawson added as cosponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-09 - Representative Lawson added as cosponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Human trafficking, promoting prostitution, and asset forfeiture. Allows a law enforcement agency to seize real or personal property, including a vehicle, that is used by a person to: (1) commit, attempt to commit, or conspire to commit; (2) facilitate the commission of; or (3) escape from the commission of; an offense concerning human trafficking or promoting prostitution.
Title
Human trafficking, promoting prostitution, and asset forfeiture. Allows a law enforcement agency to seize real or personal property, including a vehicle, that is used by a person to: (1) commit, attempt to commit, or conspire to commit; (2) facilitate the commission of; or (3) escape from the commission of; an offense concerning human trafficking or promoting prostitution.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-10 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-28 - Senate - Senate Committee on Judiciary - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-28 - Senate - Senate Committee on Judiciary - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-09 | House | Representative Lawson added as cosponsor |
2015-03-02 | House | First Reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Senator Miller, Pat added as coauthor |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Representatives Cox and Hale added as cosponsor |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Representative McNamara added as sponsor |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 127: yeas 50, nays 0 |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Senator Banks A added as coauthor |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Amendment #2 (Houchin) prevailed; voice vote |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Senators Zakas, Taylor, Delph, Randolph, Buck added as coauthors |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senator Steele added as third author |
2015-01-12 | Senate | First Reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2015-01-12 | Senate | Authored by Senators Houchin and Head |