IN SB0373 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on April 14 2021 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-19 - Senate advisors appointed: Niemeyer and Niezgodski
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Carbon credit market, carbon sequestration, and federal mandates. Requires the state department of agriculture and the department of natural resources, in consultation with Purdue University, the utility regulatory commission (IURC), agricultural producers, woodland owners, foresters, certain technical experts, the agricultural industry, the forest industry, and environmental and conservation groups, to: (1) study and make findings and recommendations concerning the potential role of the state in a voluntary carbon credit market; and (2) issue a written report to the general assembly. Requires the director of the department of natural resources to designate the operator of the carbon sequestration pilot project (pilot project) before July 31, 2021. Provides that material compliance by the pilot project with a permit for a Class VI carbon dioxide underground injection well is an affirmative defense for the pilot project against certain civil actions or claims. Provides that: (1) a claimant may overcome the affirmative defense by proving actual interference with the use of the property or direct physical injury to tangible property; and (2) recovery by a public utility for any effect of the pilot project on the sources of the utility's public water supply is not prohibited or limited. Defines a "federal phaseout mandate" as any federal statutory or regulatory requirement that: (1) is established after April 20, 2021, by Congress, a federal agency, or a federal executive order; and (2) requires the phaseout or discontinuance of a particular type of electric generating facility, technology, or fuel source. Requires the IURC to consider in the context of: (1) applications for certificates of public convenience and necessity for new generating facilities; and (2) integrated resource planning; the impact of federal phaseout mandates on the estimated useful life of certain generating facilities of an electric utility, including on depreciation expense associated with such facilities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Carbon credit market, carbon sequestration, and federal mandates.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-13 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 65 N: 30 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate Floor - (Y: 33 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-19SenateSenate advisors appointed: Niemeyer and Niezgodski
2021-04-19SenateSenate conferees appointed: Glick and Tallian
2021-04-15HouseHouse advisors appointed: Soliday, Morrison, Boy, Dvorak and Errington
2021-04-15HouseHouse conferees appointed: Lehe and Hatfield
2021-04-15SenateSenate dissented from House amendments
2021-04-15SenateMotion to dissent filed
2021-04-14HouseReturned to the Senate with amendments
2021-04-13HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 432: yeas 65, nays 30
2021-04-12HouseAmendment #2 (Soliday) prevailed; voice vote
2021-04-12HouseSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2021-04-08HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2021-04-06HouseRepresentative Dvorak added as cosponsor
2021-04-06HouseRepresentative Errington added as cosponsor
2021-04-05HouseReferred to Committee on Judiciary pursuant to House Rule 84
2021-04-05HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2021-03-04HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Natural Resources
2021-02-23SenateReferred to the House
2021-02-22SenateCosponsor: Representative Abbott D
2021-02-22SenateHouse sponsor: Representative Lehe
2021-02-22SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 161: yeas 33, nays 16
2021-02-22SenateSenator Randolph added as coauthor
2021-02-18SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2021-02-15SenateSenator Tallian added as coauthor
2021-02-15SenateSenator Ford Jon added as coauthor
2021-02-11SenateSenator Qaddoura added as coauthor
2021-02-04SenateSenators Perfect, Lanane, Tomes, Doriot added as coauthors
2021-02-01SenateCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2021-01-28SenateSenator Yoder added as coauthor
2021-01-25SenateSenator Bassler added as coauthor
2021-01-25SenateSenator Ford J.D. added as third author
2021-01-25SenateSenator Niemeyer added as second author
2021-01-12SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Natural Resources
2021-01-12SenateAuthored by Senator Glick

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2021/bills/senate/373/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/9/5/5/09552016/SB0373.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/c/9/2/3c92f2a3/SB0373.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/d/a/d/cdad7a29/SB0373.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/9/2/a/a92ace75/SB0373.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/4/b/7/44b7a30e/SB0373.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/d/5/5/0d55fee8/SB0373.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/1/a/8/81a8b9ac/SB0373.04.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/b/c/c/6bccb688/SB0373.04.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/6/1/4/561400a2/SB0373.05.ENGH.pdf
Amendmenthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/e/f/0/fef06e51/SB0373.04.COMH.AMH001.pdf
Amendmenthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/5/4/a/554aa282/SB0373.04.COMH.AMH002.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/c/a/4/cca49d4a/SB0373.01.INTR.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/4/1/1/34112578/SB0373.02.COMS.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/9/e/6/29e6d4fe/SB0373.01.INTR.CRS001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/d/9/8/6d989000/SB0373.02.COMS.FN002.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/5/c/5/a5c517b8/SB0373.02.COMS.FN003.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/f/5/4/cf546c4b/SB0373.02.COMS.CRH001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/a/1/b/5a1beca7/SB0373.03.COMH.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/7/1/a/d71a0bd5/SB0373.03.COMH.CRH001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/0/a/9/90a9ac5c/SB0373.04.COMH.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/6/b/e/36be23e4/SB0373.05.ENGH.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/3/3/f/633fbdb4/SB0373.05.ENGH.FN002.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/0/4/9/4049291a/SB0373.05.ENGH.DIS01.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/a/9/4/da945268/SB0373.01.INTR.02.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/7/2/9/172936d1/SB0373.161_S.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/e/a/c/1eacf7e9/SB0373.02.COMS.02.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/f/f/c/7ffc2104/SB0373.03.COMH.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/1/f/0/01f068bf/SB0373.432_H.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback