IN SB0373 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-16 - Public Law 127
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Pension supplemental allowance reserve accounts. Establishes supplemental allowance reserve accounts (reserve accounts) within the legislators' defined benefit plan, the state excise police, gaming agent, gaming control officer, and conservation enforcement officers' retirement plan (EGC), the public employees' retirement fund (PERF), and the pre-1996 and 1996 accounts of the Indiana state teachers' retirement fund (TRF) for the purpose of paying postretirement benefit increases, thirteenth checks, and other benefit changes or adjustments granted by the general assembly after June 30, 2018. Requires that, after June 30, 2018, the state lottery commission (commission) transfer each quarter $7,500,000 of the surplus revenue from the

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Pension supplemental allowance reserve accounts. Establishes supplemental allowance reserve accounts (reserve accounts) within the legislators' defined benefit plan, the state excise police, gaming agent, gaming control officer, and conservation enforcement officers' retirement plan (EGC), the public employees' retirement fund (PERF), and the pre-1996 and 1996 accounts of the Indiana state teachers' retirement fund (TRF) for the purpose of paying postretirement benefit increases, thirteenth checks, and other benefit changes or adjustments granted by the general assembly after June 30, 2018. Requires that, after June 30, 2018, the state lottery commission (commission) transfer each quarter $7,500,000 of the surplus revenue from the

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-07 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-10 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-16SenatePublic Law 127
2018-03-16SenateSigned by the Governor
2018-03-14SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2018-03-13HouseSigned by the Speaker
2018-03-12SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2018-03-07SenateSenate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 364: yeas 46, nays 0
2018-03-07SenateSenator Randolph added as coauthor
2018-03-06SenateMotion to concur filed
2018-03-06HouseReturned to the Senate with amendments
2018-03-05HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 317: yeas 97, nays 0
2018-03-01HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2018-02-28HouseRepresentatives Carbaugh and Taylor J added as cosponsors
2018-02-27HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2018-02-06HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Employment, Labor and Pensions
2018-02-01SenateReferred to the House
2018-01-30SenateSenator Charbonneau added as coauthor
2018-01-30SenateCosponsor: Representative Karickhoff
2018-01-30SenateHouse sponsor: Representative Burton
2018-01-30SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 110: yeas 48, nays 0
2018-01-29SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2018-01-25SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2018-01-18SenateSenator Boots added as coauthor
2018-01-18SenateSenator Niezgodski added as coauthor
2018-01-18SenateSenator Tallian added as second author
2018-01-11SenateCommittee report: amend do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Appropriations
2018-01-04SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Pensions and Labor
2018-01-04SenateAuthored by Senator Walker

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2018/bills/senate/373/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/9/f/b/59fb6199/SB0373.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/2/8/f/a28f174a/SB0373.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/2/e/f/52ef57e7/SB0373.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/1/7/b/c17bee0f/SB0373.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/b/8/6/9b86830f/SB0373.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/d/a/2/4da2114d/SB0373.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/8/2/6/98269341/SB0373.04.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/9/5/8/195892c8/SB0373.04.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/4/a/f/54af396b/SB0373.05.ENRH.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/c/f/3/fcf373ba/SB0373.01.INTR.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/8/d/6/98d60e72/SB0373.02.COMS.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/5/1/8/05181fe3/SB0373.110.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/7/0/d/e70df48d/SB0373.03.COMS.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/4/3/2/14329c74/SB0373.317.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/b/e/2/2be22e30/SB0373.364.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback