IN SB0372 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on March 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-13 - Public Law 59
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on March 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-13 - Public Law 59
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Notarial acts. Makes technical changes to standardize language concerning registration of trademarks and regulation related to notarial acts. Specifies requirements related to notarial acts, including use of electronic documentation and technology for electronic notarial acts. Requires the secretary of state to adopt rules related to electronic notarial acts and remote notarial acts. Specifies requirements for remote notarial acts, including: (1) registration of a remote notary public; (2) certification of and record keeping related to remote notarial acts; (3) use of audio visual communication and recording; (4) verification of credentials; and (5) maintenance of records. Makes conforming amendments.
Title
Notarial acts. Makes technical changes to standardize language concerning registration of trademarks and regulation related to notarial acts. Specifies requirements related to notarial acts, including use of electronic documentation and technology for electronic notarial acts. Requires the secretary of state to adopt rules related to electronic notarial acts and remote notarial acts. Specifies requirements for remote notarial acts, including: (1) registration of a remote notary public; (2) certification of and record keeping related to remote notarial acts; (3) use of audio visual communication and recording; (4) verification of credentials; and (5) maintenance of records. Makes conforming amendments.
Sponsors
Sen. Travis Holdman [R] | Sen. Rodric Bray [R] | Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] | Sen. James Buck [R] |
Rep. Martin Carbaugh [R] | Rep. Gregory Steuerwald [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-27 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-13 | Senate | Public Law 59 |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2018-03-08 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2018-02-28 | House | Returned to the Senate without amendments |
2018-02-27 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 248: yeas 95, nays 0 |
2018-02-22 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2018-02-20 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2018-02-12 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Senator Buck added as coauthor |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as coauthor |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Cosponsor: Representative Steuerwald |
2018-02-05 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Carbaugh |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 146: yeas 46, nays 1 |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Senator Bray added as second author |
2018-01-04 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Civil Law |
2018-01-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Holdman |