IN SB0372 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-13 - Public Law 249
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Youth athletic health issues.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Youth athletic health issues.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-04-26 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-15 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-02-21 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-05-13HousePublic Law 249
2013-05-11SenateSigned by the Governor
2013-05-01SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2013-04-29HouseSigned by the Speaker
2013-04-26SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2013-04-26SenateSenate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 561: yeas 48, nays 0
2013-04-25SenateMotion to concur in House amendments filed
2013-04-25SenateDissent withdrawn
2013-04-17HouseHouse advisors appointed: Bacon, Porter and Battles
2013-04-17HouseHouse conferees appointed: Frizzell and V. Smith
2013-04-16SenateSenate advisor appointed: Pat Miller and Mrvan
2013-04-16SenateSenate conferee appointed: Holdman and R. Young
2013-04-16SenateSenate dissented from House amendments
2013-04-15HouseRepresentative Porter added as cosponsor
2013-04-15HouseReturned to the Senate with amendments
2013-04-15HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 481: yeas 92, nays 0
2013-04-11HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2013-04-09HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2013-03-12HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Education
2013-02-21SenateSenator Landske added as coauthor
2013-02-21SenateCosponsor: Rep. Bacon
2013-02-21SenateHouse sponsor: Rep. Frizzell
2013-02-21SenateReferred to the House
2013-02-21SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 170: yeas 47 and nays 1
2013-02-19SenateSenator Pat Miller added as second author
2013-02-18SenateAmendment 1 (Holdman), prevailed; voice vote
2013-02-18SenateSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2013-02-14SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2013-02-07SenateSenator R. Young added as coauthor
2013-01-08SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services
2013-01-08SenateAuthored by Senator Holdman

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback