IN SB0370 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-22 - Public Law 102
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Limitation on actions concerning deposit accounts. Amends the statute concerning the statute of limitations for actions upon promissory notes, bills of exchange, or other written contracts for the payment of money to include actions upon deposit accounts. Specifies that the bill's provisions are intended to be a restatement of the law and not a substantive change in the law and as such shall be applied with respect to deposit accounts executed during the applicable time frames set forth in the statute.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Limitation on actions concerning deposit accounts.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-01 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - House - House Floor - (Y: 94 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-22SenatePublic Law 102
2021-04-22SenateSigned by the Governor
2021-04-21SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2021-04-13HouseSigned by the Speaker
2021-04-12SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2021-04-01SenateSenate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 322: yeas 48, nays 0
2021-03-29SenateMotion to concur filed
2021-03-16HouseReturned to the Senate with amendments
2021-03-15HouseRepresentative Ellington added as cosponsor
2021-03-15HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 260: yeas 94, nays 1
2021-03-11HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2021-03-09HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2021-03-02HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance
2021-02-12SenateReferred to the House
2021-02-11SenateSenator Bohacek added as second author
2021-02-11SenateCosponsor: Representative Schaibley
2021-02-11SenateHouse sponsor: Representative Carbaugh
2021-02-11SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 96: yeas 47, nays 0
2021-02-09SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2021-02-04SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2021-01-12SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Insurance and Financial Institutions
2021-01-12SenateAuthored by Senator Zay

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2021/bills/senate/370/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/6/2/3/56237026/SB0370.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/1/8/f/718ff34c/SB0370.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/7/4/0/5740ca07/SB0370.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/7/3/c/b73cbb12/SB0370.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/6/3/d/a63d7948/SB0370.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/c/2/7/7c272dda/SB0370.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/e/b/5/9eb5e881/SB0370.04.ENRH.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/5/a/8/55a82f32/SB0370.01.INTR.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/8/b/3/08b335fd/SB0370.01.INTR.CRS001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/5/b/3/a5b32631/SB0370.02.COMS.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/6/9/3/e6936cc2/SB0370.02.COMS.FN002.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/9/7/7/19771595/SB0370.02.COMS.FN003.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/8/6/7/78674266/SB0370.03.COMH.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/6/8/8/76880f5b/SB0370.02.COMS.CRH001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/c/8/4/2c84adb5/SB0370.03.COMH.FN002.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/6/2/c/862c54bf/SB0370.03.COMH.FN003.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/3/8/4/8384757c/SB0370.03.COMH.CON01.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/2/6/b/b26b2dec/SB0370.04.ENRH.FN001.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/d/8/7/3d877123/SB0370.01.INTR.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/7/e/2/77e2ead6/SB0370.96_S.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/6/9/9/26994604/SB0370.02.COMS.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/d/2/6/cd2618a9/SB0370.260_H.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/1/2/0/1120a122/SB0370.322_S.pdf

Bill Comments 750

feedback