IN SB0370 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-3)
Status: Passed on May 7 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-07 - Public Law 229
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

State emblems. Designates the Republic Aviation P-47 Thunderbolt as the official state aircraft of Indiana.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State emblems. Designates the Republic Aviation P-47 Thunderbolt as the official state aircraft of Indiana.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-04-28 - Senate - Senate - Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-27 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-03-31 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-24 - House - House Committee on Veterans Affairs and Public Safety - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - Senate - Senate Committee on Veterans Affairs & The Military - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-05-07SenatePublic Law 229
2015-05-07SenateSigned by the Governor
2015-05-04SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2015-04-29HouseSigned by the Speaker
2015-04-29SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2015-04-28SenateConference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 518: yeas 48, nays 0
2015-04-27HouseRules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 543: yeas 93, nays 0
2015-04-16HouseHouse Advisors appointed: Sullivan, Richardson, Pierce and Klinker
2015-04-16HouseHouse Conferees appointed: Bacon and Riecken
2015-04-09SenateSenate Advisors appointed: Tomes and Stoops
2015-04-09SenateSenate Conferees appointed: Becker and Arnold J
2015-04-09SenateSenate dissented from House amendments
2015-04-09SenateMotion to dissent filed
2015-04-09SenateConcurrrence withdrawn
2015-04-07SenateMotion to concur filed
2015-04-01HouseReturned to the Senate with amendments
2015-03-31HouseRepresentative Pierce added as cosponsor
2015-03-31HouseRule 105.1 suspended
2015-03-31HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 351: yeas 97, nays 0
2015-03-30HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2015-03-26HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2015-03-03HouseFirst Reading: referred to Committee on Veterans Affairs and Public Safety
2015-02-16SenateReferred to the House
2015-02-10SenateSenator Kruse added as coauthor
2015-02-10SenateRepresentatives McNamara, Sullivan, Riecken added as cosponsors
2015-02-10SenateRepresentative Bacon added as sponsor
2015-02-10SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 126: yeas 50, nays 0
2015-02-09SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2015-02-05SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2015-02-02SenateSenator Arnold added as coauthor
2015-01-29SenatePursuant to Senate Rule 68(b); reassigned to Committee on Veterans Affairs & The Military
2015-01-12SenateFirst Reading: referred to Committee on Rules & Legislative Procedure
2015-01-12SenateCoauthored by Senators Banks A and Schneider
2015-01-12SenateAuthored by Senators Becker, Tomes, Waltz

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2015/bills/senate/370/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/a/c/d/5acdaac7/SB0370.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/5/c/d/75cda7df/SB0370.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/a/9/9/1a99245c/SB0370.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/0/4/3/60432a7e/SB0370.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/0/6/9/006905dd/SB0370.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/c/e/c/8cec02e1/SB0370.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/8/8/3/9883bda1/SB0370.04.ENRS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/2/a/1/b2a143d4/SB0370.01.INTR.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/6/c/f/26cf7631/SB0370.126.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/b/8/c/db8cbfe7/SB0370.02.COMS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/b/7/4/ab7473bd/SB0370.351.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/a/c/f/8acf8355/SB0370.543.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/0/4/a/504a01f6/SB0370.518.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback