IN SB0370 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-13 - Public Law 80
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Specifies requirements related to title insurance policy filings and closing protection letter issuance.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Title insurance.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-04-04 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-04-01 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-02-19 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 46 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-05-13HousePublic Law 80
2013-04-24SenateSigned by the Governor
2013-04-17HouseSigned by the Speaker
2013-04-17SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2013-04-08SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2013-04-04SenateSenate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 382: yeas 48, nays 0
2013-04-03SenateMotion to concur in House amendments filed
2013-04-01HouseReturned to the Senate with amendments
2013-04-01HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 370: yeas 97, nays 0
2013-03-28HouseAmendment 1 (Lehman), prevailed; voice vote
2013-03-28HouseSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2013-03-25HouseRepresentatives DeLaney, Klinker and Braun added as cosponsors
2013-03-21HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2013-03-12HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Insurance
2013-02-19SenateHouse sponsor: Rep. Lehman
2013-02-19SenateReferred to the House
2013-02-19SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 155: yeas 46 and nays 3
2013-02-18SenateSenator Paul added as second author
2013-02-12SenateSenator Mrvan added as coauthor
2013-02-12SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2013-02-07SenateCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2013-01-08SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Insurance
2013-01-08SenateAuthored by Senator Holdman

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback