IN SB0370 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on February 27 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-16 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on February 27 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-16 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for the board of funeral and cemetery service to create a courtesy card for funeral directors licensed in states that border Indiana beginning January 1, 2013, authorizing the funeral directors to provide certain funeral services in Indiana.
Title
Funeral services courtesy cards.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-27 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-01-24 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-24 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-16 | Signed by the Governor | |
2012-03-09 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2012-03-08 | Signed by the President Pro Tempore | |
2012-03-08 | Signed by the Speaker | |
2012-02-27 | Returned to the Senate without amendments | |
2012-02-27 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 248: yeas 96, nays 0 | |
2012-02-23 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | |
2012-02-20 | Committee report: do pass, adopted | |
2012-01-31 | First reading: referred to Committee on Commerce, Small Business and Economic Development | |
2012-01-24 | Cosponsor: Rep. Summers | |
2012-01-24 | House sponsor: Rep. Foley | |
2012-01-24 | Referred to the House | |
2012-01-24 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 75: yeas 50 and nays 0 | |
2012-01-23 | Amendment 1 (Mishler), prevailed; voice vote | |
2012-01-23 | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed | |
2012-01-19 | Senator Steele added as second author | |
2012-01-17 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | |
2012-01-09 | First reading: referred to Committee on Commerce & Economic Development | |
2012-01-09 | Authored by Senator Mishler |