IN SB0369 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-25 - Public Law 206
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-25 - Public Law 206
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Workers' compensation drug formulary. Except during a medical emergency, prohibits workers' compensation and occupational disease compensation reimbursement for drugs specified in the ODG Workers' Compensation Drug Formulary Appendix A published by MCG Health as "N" drugs. Permits a prescribing physician to request to prescribe an "N" drug. Provides that, if the employer approves the request, the prescribing physician may prescribe the "N" drug. Provides that, if the employer does not approve the request, the employer shall: (1) shall send the request to a third party that is certified by the Utilization Review Accreditation Commission to make a determination concerning the
Title
Workers' compensation drug formulary. Except during a medical emergency, prohibits workers' compensation and occupational disease compensation reimbursement for drugs specified in the ODG Workers' Compensation Drug Formulary Appendix A published by MCG Health as "N" drugs. Permits a prescribing physician to request to prescribe an "N" drug. Provides that, if the employer approves the request, the prescribing physician may prescribe the "N" drug. Provides that, if the employer does not approve the request, the employer shall: (1) shall send the request to a third party that is certified by the Utilization Review Accreditation Commission to make a determination concerning the
Sponsors
Sen. Randall Head [R] | Sen. Philip Boots [R] | Sen. Greg Walker [R] | Sen. Michael Delph [R] |
Sen. James Merritt [R] | Sen. Dennis Kruse [R] | Sen. Jeff Raatz [R] | Rep. Matthew Lehman [R] |
Rep. Anthony Cook [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-06 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments (Y: 40 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 67 N: 28 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - House - House - Amendment #3 (Moseley) failed (Y: 29 N: 64 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2018-02-26 - House - House - Amendment #5 (Moseley) failed (Y: 29 N: 63 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2018-02-20 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 42 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 67 N: 28 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - House - House - Amendment #3 (Moseley) failed (Y: 29 N: 64 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2018-02-26 - House - House - Amendment #5 (Moseley) failed (Y: 29 N: 63 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2018-02-20 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 42 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-25 | Senate | Public Law 206 |
2018-03-25 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2018-03-13 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 351: yeas 40, nays 9 |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Motion to concur filed |
2018-02-28 | House | Returned to the Senate with amendments |
2018-02-27 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 247: yeas 66, nays 29 |
2018-02-26 | House | Amendment #3 (Moseley) failed; Roll Call 220: yeas 29, nays 64 |
2018-02-26 | House | Amendment #4 (Moseley) failed; voice vote |
2018-02-26 | House | Amendment #5 (Moseley) failed; Roll Call 219: yeas 29, nays 63 |
2018-02-26 | House | Amendment #2 (Lehman) prevailed; voice vote |
2018-02-26 | House | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2018-02-20 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2018-02-12 | House | Representative Cook added as cosponsor |
2018-02-12 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Employment, Labor and Pensions |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Senators Merritt, Kruse, Raatz added as coauthors |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Senator Delph added as coauthor |
2018-02-06 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Lehman |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 183: yeas 42, nays 6 |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 35 (c); technical correction committee report adopted |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Senator Walker added as third author |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Senator Boots added as second author |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Amendment #6 (Tallian) failed; voice vote |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Amendment #10 (Tallian) failed; voice vote |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Amendment #8 (Tallian) failed; voice vote |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Amendment #5 (Tallian) failed; voice vote |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Amendment #11 (Tallian) prevailed; voice vote |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Amendment #9 (Tallian) prevailed; voice vote |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Amendment #4 (Head) prevailed; voice vote |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Head) prevailed; voice vote |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2018-01-04 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Pensions and Labor |
2018-01-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Head |