IN SB0369 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-08 - Veto sustained by the Senate;
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-08 - Veto sustained by the Senate;
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Minimum wage for certain Indiana employees. After: (1) June 30, 2016, increases the minimum wage paid to certain employees in Indiana from $7.25 to $12.00; and (2) June 30, 2017, increases the minimum wage paid to certain employees in Indiana from $12.00 to $15.00; an hour. After June 30, 2018, and each successive June 30, increases the hourly minimum wage in the same percentage as any increase in the Consumer Price Index for the preceding calendar year. Makes technical corrections and corresponding changes. Removes outdated language.
Title
Minimum wage for certain Indiana employees. After: (1) June 30, 2016, increases the minimum wage paid to certain employees in Indiana from $7.25 to $12.00; and (2) June 30, 2017, increases the minimum wage paid to certain employees in Indiana from $12.00 to $15.00; an hour. After June 30, 2018, and each successive June 30, increases the hourly minimum wage in the same percentage as any increase in the Consumer Price Index for the preceding calendar year. Makes technical corrections and corresponding changes. Removes outdated language.
Sponsors
Sen. Frank Mrvan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-08 | Senate | Veto sustained by the Senate; |
2016-01-11 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Pensions & Labor |
2016-01-11 | Senate | Authored by Senator Mrvan |
Indiana State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://iga.in.gov/legislative/2016/bills/senate/369/details |
Text | http://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/8/3/d/e83dd955/SB0369.01.INTR.pdf |