IN SB0369 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on May 8 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-08 - Vetoed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Publication and Internet posting of information. Requires local governments and school corporations to provide information for posting on the Indiana transparency Internet web site as follows: (1) Expenditures categorized by personal services, other operating expenses or total operating expenses, and debt service, including lease payments, related to debt. (2) A listing of fund balances, specifically identifying balances in funds that are being used for accumulation of money for future capital needs. Requires the department of local government finance (DLGF) after July 31, 2016, to publish an annual financial and operational summary of each political subdivision on the Indiana transparency Internet

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Publication and Internet posting of information. Requires local governments and school corporations to provide information for posting on the Indiana transparency Internet web site as follows: (1) Expenditures categorized by personal services, other operating expenses or total operating expenses, and debt service, including lease payments, related to debt. (2) A listing of fund balances, specifically identifying balances in funds that are being used for accumulation of money for future capital needs. Requires the department of local government finance (DLGF) after July 31, 2016, to publish an annual financial and operational summary of each political subdivision on the Indiana transparency Internet

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-04-29 - Senate - Senate - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 46 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 92 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-30 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-03-24 - House - House Committee on Government and Regulatory Reform - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-01-27 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-21 - Senate - Senate Committee on Local Government - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-05-08SenateVetoed by the Governor
2015-05-04SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2015-04-29SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2015-04-29HouseSigned by the Speaker
2015-04-29SenateRules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 534: yeas 46, nays 2
2015-04-28HouseRules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 560: yeas 92, nays 5
2015-04-14HouseHouse Advisors appointed: Torr, Riecken and Errington
2015-04-14HouseHouse Conferees appointed: Zent and Niezgodski
2015-04-02SenateSenate dissented from House amendments
2015-04-02SenateSenate Advisors appointed: Buck, Broden and Brown L
2015-04-02SenateSenate Conferees appointed: Miller Pete and Breaux
2015-04-01SenateMotion to dissent filed
2015-03-31HouseReturned to the Senate with amendments
2015-03-30HouseRepresentative Niezgodski added as cosponsor
2015-03-30HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 340: yeas 89, nays 0
2015-03-26HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2015-03-24HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2015-03-17HouseRepresentative Huston added as cosponsor
2015-03-17HouseRule 105.1 suspended
2015-03-02HouseRepresentative Schaibley added as cosponsor
2015-03-02HouseFirst Reading: referred to Committee on Government and Regulatory Reform
2015-02-03SenateReferred to the House
2015-01-27SenateSenator Randolph added as coauthor
2015-01-27SenateSenator Breaux added as second author
2015-01-27SenateRepresentative Zent added as sponsor
2015-01-27SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 52: yeas 49, nays 0
2015-01-26SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2015-01-22SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2015-01-12SenateFirst Reading: referred to Committee on Local Government
2015-01-12SenateAuthored by Senator Miller Pete

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2015/bills/senate/369/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/2/4/0/a2400cda/SB0369.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/6/9/0/369042cd/SB0369.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/3/9/6/d39694df/SB0369.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/8/4/0/88406be0/SB0369.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/5/5/3/5553d13a/SB0369.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/d/2/2/ad22d1ee/SB0369.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/3/6/1/436160c6/SB0369.04.ENRS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/5/8/5/35857db3/SB0369.01.INTR.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/c/e/0/1ce0e750/SB0369.52.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/9/5/a/295ae90a/SB0369.02.COMS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/4/7/5/f4753608/SB0369.340.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/a/f/1/3af13af0/SB0369.560.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/9/c/5/a9c50c57/SB0369.534.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback