IN SB0368 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-29 - Public Law 157
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Juvenile justice. Provides for the automatic expungement of certain juvenile offenses. Prohibits a juvenile arrestee who meets certain requirements from being housed with adult inmates prior to trial, with certain exceptions. Establishes a procedure for determining juvenile competency. Provides that after a juvenile court has determined that a child is a dual status child, the juvenile court may refer the child to be assessed by a dual status assessment team under certain circumstances.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Juvenile justice.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-14 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-29SenatePublic Law 157
2021-04-29SenateSigned by the Governor
2021-04-28SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2021-04-22HouseSigned by the Speaker
2021-04-21SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2021-04-14SenateSenate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 439: yeas 48, nays 0
2021-04-12SenateMotion to concur filed
2021-04-09HouseReturned to the Senate with amendments
2021-04-08HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 377: yeas 87, nays 0
2021-04-06HouseAmendment #1 (McNamara) prevailed; voice vote
2021-04-06HouseSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2021-04-01HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2021-03-25HouseReferred to the Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127
2021-03-25HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2021-03-04HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code
2021-02-24SenateReferred to the House
2021-02-23SenateSenator Buck added as coauthor
2021-02-23SenateCosponsors: Representatives Pierce, Steuerwald, Hatcher
2021-02-23SenateHouse sponsor: Representative McNamara
2021-02-23SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 197: yeas 46, nays 1
2021-02-22SenateAmendment #3 (Young M) prevailed; voice vote
2021-02-22SenateAmendment #2 (Tallian) prevailed; voice vote
2021-02-22SenateSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2021-02-15SenateSenator Glick added as second author
2021-02-11SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2021-02-02SenateSenator Breaux added as coauthor
2021-01-12SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Corrections and Criminal Law
2021-01-12SenateAuthored by Senator Tallian

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2021/bills/senate/368/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/8/b/9/98b902d1/SB0368.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/1/0/e/210e9c30/SB0368.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/3/8/7/f3871118/SB0368.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/b/1/3/db13e60e/SB0368.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/1/8/8/b188cb2e/SB0368.03.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/c/2/7/8c276923/SB0368.03.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/4/6/4/a464058b/SB0368.04.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/f/e/1/6fe1329e/SB0368.04.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/4/1/f/e41fc61c/SB0368.05.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/e/e/c/5eec33f9/SB0368.05.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/3/2/e/632e660e/SB0368.06.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/d/6/d/7d6da711/SB0368.06.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/0/f/8/c0f8e68b/SB0368.07.ENRH.pdf
Amendmenthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/e/7/a/de7a98ce/SB0368.02.COMS.AMS001.pdf
Amendmenthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/2/d/1/f2d1e887/SB0368.02.COMS.AMS002.pdf
Amendmenthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/d/5/2/8d524ced/SB0368.02.COMS.AMS003.pdf
Amendmenthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/7/8/b/978bf2d1/SB0368.05.COMH.AMH001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/1/b/7/41b71fd1/SB0368.01.INTR.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/7/d/3/07d33e91/SB0368.01.INTR.CRS001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/7/d/e/27de60d7/SB0368.02.COMS.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/b/f/7/cbf7f2d9/SB0368.02.COMS.FN002.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/2/d/9/82d9dea4/SB0368.03.ENGS.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/7/7/f/a77f8f46/SB0368.03.ENGS.FN002.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/8/4/5/08452ec9/SB0368.03.ENGS.CRH001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/4/1/f/c41f16db/SB0368.04.COMH.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/f/1/1/af1146bd/SB0368.04.COMH.CRH001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/c/3/1/fc3193b6/SB0368.05.COMH.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/4/f/1/44f1b2c6/SB0368.06.ENGH.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/8/4/4/a8446285/SB0368.06.ENGH.FN002.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/6/7/4/3674f259/SB0368.06.ENGH.CON01.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/6/d/1/06d1d0bc/SB0368.07.ENRH.FN001.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/8/5/2/7852fd38/SB0368.01.INTR.01.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/0/2/1/30210676/SB0368.197_S.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/6/7/0/d6704b07/SB0368.03.ENGS.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/b/8/b/1b8bde15/SB0368.04.COMH.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/1/1/7/6117d8a0/SB0368.377_H.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/e/2/6/be26b92e/SB0368.439_S.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback