IN SB0365 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on March 10 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-10 - Public Law 65
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on March 10 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-10 - Public Law 65
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Psychology interjurisdictional compact. Establishes the psychology interjurisdictional compact concerning interjurisdictional telepsychology and the temporary authorization to practice psychology in another compact state. Sets forth requirements of a compact state. Sets forth the duties of the psychology interjurisdictional compact commission.
Title
Psychology interjurisdictional compact.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Messmer [R] | Sen. Vaneta Becker [R] | Rep. Cindy Ziemke [R] | Rep. Edward Clere [R] |
Rep. Matthew Lehman [R] | Rep. Mike Andrade [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-24 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 81 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-19 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-19 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-10 | Senate | Public Law 65 |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2022-03-04 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2022-02-25 | House | Returned to the Senate without amendments |
2022-02-24 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 268: yeas 81, nays 1 |
2022-02-23 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2022-02-21 | House | Representatives Lehman and Andrade M added as cosponsors |
2022-02-21 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2022-02-10 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127 |
2022-02-10 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2022-02-01 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Public Health |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Cosponsor: Representative Clere |
2022-01-25 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Ziemke |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 82: yeas 46, nays 0 |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Senator Becker added as second author |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Senator Messmer added as author |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Senator Becker removed as author |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Senator Messmer removed as second author |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2022-01-11 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Authored by Senators Becker and Messmer |