IN SB0363 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on March 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-21 - Public Law 168
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on March 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-21 - Public Law 168
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
FSSA matters. Corrects outdated references to the "division of aging and rehabilitative services" to refer instead to the "division of disability and rehabilitative services". Removes references to home care services from the long term care ombudsman program. Removes the requirement that the long term care ombudsman (ombudsman) report the findings of the long term care ombudsman office (office) to the complainant. Allows the office to disclose records, documents, and findings of an investigated case to certain individuals with the informed consent of the resident of the long term care facility or the resident's legal guardian. Specifies the manner in which
Title
FSSA matters. Corrects outdated references to the "division of aging and rehabilitative services" to refer instead to the "division of disability and rehabilitative services". Removes references to home care services from the long term care ombudsman program. Removes the requirement that the long term care ombudsman (ombudsman) report the findings of the long term care ombudsman office (office) to the complainant. Allows the office to disclose records, documents, and findings of an investigated case to certain individuals with the informed consent of the resident of the long term care facility or the resident's legal guardian. Specifies the manner in which
Sponsors
Sen. Ed Charbonneau [R] | Sen. Randall Head [R] | Sen. John Ruckelshaus [R] | Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] |
Rep. Cindy Kirchhofer [R] | Rep. Ronald Bacon [R] | Rep. Anthony Cook [R] | Rep. Robin Shackleford [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-14 - Senate - Senate - Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-18 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-10 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-18 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-10 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-21 | Senate | Public Law 168 |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2018-03-19 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 386: yeas 48, nays 0 |
2018-03-13 | House | Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 385: yeas 97, nays 0 |
2018-03-13 | Senate | CCR # 1 filed in the Senate |
2018-03-13 | House | CCR # 1 filed in the House |
2018-03-07 | House | House advisors appointed: Bacon and Brown C |
2018-03-07 | House | House conferees appointed: Kirchhofer and Shackleford |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Senate advisors appointed: Head, Stoops and Ruckelshaus |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Senate conferees appointed: Charbonneau and Breaux |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Senate dissented from House amendments |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Motion to dissent filed |
2018-02-28 | House | Returned to the Senate with amendments |
2018-02-27 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 246: yeas 96, nays 0 |
2018-02-26 | House | Amendment #1 (Kirchhofer) prevailed; voice vote |
2018-02-26 | House | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2018-02-15 | House | Representative Shackleford added as cosponsor |
2018-02-15 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2018-02-12 | House | Representative Cook added as cosponsor |
2018-02-06 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Public Health |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as coauthor |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Senator Ruckelshaus added as third author |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Senator Head added as second author |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Cosponsor: Representative Bacon |
2018-01-18 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Kirchhofer |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 30: yeas 49, nays 0 |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2018-01-11 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2018-01-04 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services |
2018-01-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Charbonneau |