IN SB0360 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-18 - Effective 07/01/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-18 - Effective 07/01/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Specifies requirements for use of retained asset accounts for life insurance claim settlements.
Title
Retained asset accounts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-08 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2011-02-22 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 45 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-22 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 45 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-18 | Effective 07/01/2011 | |
2011-05-17 | Public Law 67 | |
2011-04-26 | Signed by the Governor | |
2011-04-19 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2011-04-18 | Signed by the Speaker | |
2011-04-14 | Signed by the President Pro Tempore | |
2011-04-08 | Returned to the Senate without amendments | |
2011-04-08 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 442: yeas 88, nays 0 | |
2011-04-07 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | |
2011-04-04 | Committee report: do pass, adopted | |
2011-03-28 | First reading: referred to Committee on Insurance | |
2011-02-22 | Cosponsor: Rep. C. Fry | |
2011-02-22 | House sponsor: Rep. Lehman | |
2011-02-22 | Referred to the House | |
2011-02-22 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 198: yeas 45 and nays 3 | |
2011-02-14 | Amendment 1 (Simpson), prevailed; | |
2011-02-14 | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed | |
2011-02-10 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | |
2011-01-11 | First reading: referred to Committee on Insurance and Financial Institutions | |
2011-01-11 | Authored by Senators Simpson and Holdman |