IN SB0359 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on March 27 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-27 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Provides that a person may not operate a confined feeding operation without obtaining the prior approval of the department of environmental management. Provides for renewal of an approval for the construction, expansion, or operation of a confined feeding operation. Provides that the law concerning the registration of composting facilities applies to facilities for the composting of vegetative matter and other organic material. (Currently the law applies only to facilities for the composting of vegetative matter resulting from landscaping maintenance and land clearing projects.) Specifies the conditions under which an application for registration of a composting facility may be denied or a registration may be revoked. Requires a person who applies for approval to construct or expand a satellite manure storage structure to provide notice concerning the approval to: (1) the county executive of the county in which the satellite manure storage structure is to be constructed or expanded; and (2) each owner and each occupant of land of which any part of the boundary is one-half mile or less from any part of the proposed footprint of the satellite manure storage structure.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Confined feeding, composting, and manure storage.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-03-05 - Senate - Senate - Motion to Concur in House Amendments (Y: 45 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - House - House Floor - (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - House - House Floor - (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - House - House Floor - (Y: 33 N: 63 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2014-02-19 - House - House Committee on Environmental Affairs - Roll Call 035902 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-03 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: Passed: (Y: 45 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-01-27 - Senate - Senate Committee on Environmental Affairs - Roll Call 035901 (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-03-27SenateSigned by the Governor
2014-03-27SenatePublic Law 199
2014-03-18SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2014-03-13HouseSigned by the Speaker
2014-03-12SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2014-03-05SenateMotion to Concur in House Amendments: prevailed; Roll Call 363: yeas 45 and nays 3
2014-02-25HouseReturned to the Senate with amendments
2014-02-25HouseThird reading: Passed: Roll Call 284: yeas 95 and nays 0
2014-02-24HouseSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed.
2014-02-24HouseSB 359 Amendment #1 (Dvorak), failed.
2014-02-24HouseSB 359 Amendment #2 (Lehe), prevailed.
2014-02-20HouseCommittee report: do pass, adopted.
2014-02-10HouseFirst Reading: Referred to Environmental Affairs
2014-02-03SenateRepresentative Niemeyer added as cosponsor.
2014-02-03SenateRepresentative Gutwein added as cosponsor.
2014-02-03SenateRepresentative Lehe added sponsor.
2014-02-03SenateReferred to the House
2014-02-03SenateThird reading: Passed: Roll Call 121: yeas 45 and nays 2
2014-01-30SenateSecond reading: engrossed
2014-01-28SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted.
2014-01-27SenateSenator Randolph added as third author.
2014-01-27SenateSenator Leising added as second author.
2014-01-14SenateFirst Reading: Referred to Environmental Affairs
2014-01-14SenateAuthored by Senator Charbonneau.

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2014/bills/senate/359/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/f/6/1/7f61c27d/SB0359.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/f/b/9/afb98bc2/SB0359.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/a/4/5/da45073e/SB0359.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/c/b/3/5cb304a3/SB0359.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/b/7/4/eb74450d/SB0359.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/e/d/e/9eded489/SB0359.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/9/3/f/293fe168/SB0359.04.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/7/8/1/5781eb10/SB0359.04.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/c/3/e/0c3e5f9f/SB0359.05.ENRS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/7/d/e/07de46a6/SB0359.01.INTR.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/a/6/1/1a61a272/SB0359.02.COMS.121.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/f/3/6/cf360da9/SB0359.02.COMS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/9/3/8/89385c1e/SB0359.03.COMH.259.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/a/9/e/3a9ef34a/SB0359.03.COMH.284.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/4/8/5/b485d67c/SB0359.04.ENGH.284.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/f/2/d/6f2d2672/SB0359.04.ENGH.363.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback