IN SB0358 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-29 - Public Law 155
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

School buildings. Provides that before a governing body may sell, exchange, lease, demolish, hold without operating, or dispose of a school building, the governing body shall: (1) obtain a certification from the attorney general's office; and (2) make the building available for lease or purchase by a charter school or state educational institution. Provides that before a governing body may sell, exchange, lease, demolish, hold without operating, or dispose of a school building, the governing body must receive a certification from the attorney general to ensure that the governing body is in compliance with requirements for making a vacant school building available for sale or lease to a charter school or state educational institution for $1. Requires the attorney general to investigate complaints that a school corporation has not complied with the requirements for making a vacant school building available for sale or lease to a charter school or state educational institution for $1. Provides that, in the event that a complaint is substantiated, the attorney general, in consultation with the department of education (department) and Indiana state board of education (state board), is authorized to take any action necessary to remedy a substantiated complaint, which may include actions to be performed by the state board or the department to ensure compliance of a school corporation. Provides that, if a school corporation does not comply with the requirements to sell a vacant school building, as determined by the attorney general, the school corporation shall submit any proceeds from the sale of the vacant school building to the state board. Provides that the state board shall distribute proceeds collected equally between each charter school located in the attendance area of the school corporation. Provides that, if no charter schools are located in the attendance area, the state board must use the proceeds to provide grants under the charter school and innovation grant program. Provides that a lease of school property entered into by a governing body prior to January 1, 2019, with a state accredited nonpublic school shall remain in full force and effect. (Current law provides that a lease of school property entered into by a governing body prior to July 1, 2019, with a state accredited nonpublic school shall remain in full force and effect.) Provides that a school corporation is responsible for maintaining a vacant school building until it is: (1) sold or leased to a charter school or state educational institution; (2) sold to an accredited nonpublic school or postsecondary educational institution other than a state educational institution; or (3) eligible to be sold or otherwise disposed.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

School buildings.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-13 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments (Y: 28 N: 21 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 52 N: 40 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 30 N: 16 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate - Amendment #2 (Ford J.D.) failed (Y: 10 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-02-17 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-29SenatePublic Law 155
2021-04-29SenateSigned by the Governor
2021-04-28SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2021-04-22HouseSigned by the Speaker
2021-04-21SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2021-04-13SenateSenate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 436: yeas 28, nays 21
2021-04-09SenateMotion to concur filed
2021-04-07HouseReturned to the Senate with amendments
2021-04-06HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 369: yeas 52, nays 40
2021-04-05HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2021-04-01HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2021-03-04HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Education
2021-02-24SenateReferred to the House
2021-02-23SenateCosponsors: Representatives DeVon and Teshka J
2021-02-23SenateHouse sponsor: Representative Behning
2021-02-23SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 194: yeas 30, nays 16
2021-02-22SenateAmendment #2 (Ford J.D.) failed; Roll Call 145: yeas 10, nays 39
2021-02-22SenateAmendment #1 (Rogers) prevailed; voice vote
2021-02-22SenateSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2021-02-18SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2021-02-15SenateSenator Kruse added as third author
2021-02-15SenateSenator Raatz added as second author
2021-01-11SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Education and Career Development
2021-01-11SenateAuthored by Senator Rogers

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2021/bills/senate/358/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/2/1/7/d2171090/SB0358.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/c/2/d/3c2da726/SB0358.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/3/5/3/03537ae4/SB0358.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/c/3/6/9c36b6e1/SB0358.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/9/a/a/99aaf6e5/SB0358.03.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/2/6/8/32686f0a/SB0358.03.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/c/d/f/4cdfcca0/SB0358.04.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/8/7/e/087ee01c/SB0358.04.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/4/0/e/640e8047/SB0358.05.ENRH.pdf
Amendmenthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/8/8/1/c881af64/SB0358.02.COMS.AMS001.pdf
Amendmenthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/2/6/5/22659a3e/SB0358.02.COMS.AMS002.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/e/9/3/7e934ca2/SB0358.01.INTR.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/6/1/4/e614a003/SB0358.01.INTR.CRS001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/e/6/6/1e66459f/SB0358.02.COMS.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/d/c/6/bdc65dd0/SB0358.03.ENGS.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/8/4/5/08454e0e/SB0358.03.ENGS.FN002.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/9/1/4/891472f3/SB0358.03.ENGS.CRH001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/0/0/5/f005beea/SB0358.04.COMH.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/5/b/f/95bfc0b4/SB0358.04.COMH.FN002.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/d/5/e/9d5ebf52/SB0358.04.COMH.FN003.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/6/0/7/5607532f/SB0358.04.COMH.CON01.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/0/c/4/80c484b4/SB0358.05.ENRH.FN001.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/7/7/b/f77bde4f/SB0358.01.INTR.04.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/e/4/a/1e4ace95/SB0358.145_S.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/b/c/5/2bc58ef9/SB0358.194_S.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/d/3/7/7d379b37/SB0358.03.ENGS.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/3/4/5/13456a63/SB0358.369_H.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/6/a/6/b6a66844/SB0358.436_S.pdf

Bill Comments 750

feedback