IN SB0357 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-26 - Public Law 165
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Subject to federal approval, authorizes the state seed commissioner to license the cultivation and production of industrial hemp. Establishes requirements to obtain a license. Authorizes inspections by the state police and audits by the state seed commissioner. Provides that in addition to any other liability or penalty, the state seed commissioner may revoke or refuse to renew a license and may impose a civil penalty. Requires the state seed commissioner to apply for necessary permissions, waivers, or other forms of legal status by the United States Drug Enforcement Agency or other appropriate federal agency that are necessary to implement the law. Makes a conforming amendment to the definition of "marijuana".

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Industrial hemp.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-03-13 - Senate - Senate - Conference Committee Report 1 adopted (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 adopted (Y: 92 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-03 - House - House Floor - (Y: 93 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - House - House Committee on Agriculture and Rural Development - Roll Call 035702 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-02-03 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: Passed: (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-01-24 - Senate - Senate Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources - Roll Call 035701 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-03-26SenatePublic Law 165
2014-03-26SenateSigned by the Governor
2014-03-18SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2014-03-14SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2014-03-14HouseSigned by the Speaker
2014-03-13SenateConference Committee Report 1 adopted; Roll Call 416: yeas 45 and nays 0
2014-03-12HouseRules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 adopted; Roll Call 475: yeas 92 and nays 6
2014-03-05HouseRepresentative Klinker added as advisor
2014-03-05HouseRepresentative Baird added as advisor
2014-03-05HouseRepresentative Moed added as conferee
2014-03-05HouseRepresentative Lehe added as conferee
2014-03-04SenateSenator Steele added as advisor
2014-03-04SenateSenator Hume added as advisor
2014-03-04SenateSenator Bray added as advisor
2014-03-04SenateSenator R. Young added as conferee
2014-03-04SenateSenator Yoder added as conferee
2014-03-04SenateSenate dissented from House amendments
2014-03-03HouseReturned to the Senate with amendments
2014-03-03HouseThird reading: Passed: Roll Call 378: yeas 93 and nays 4
2014-02-27HouseSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed.
2014-02-27HouseSB 357 Amendment #1 (Lehe), prevailed.
2014-02-25HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted.
2014-02-20HouseRepresentative Moed added as cosponsor.
2014-02-11HouseFirst Reading: Referred to Agriculture and Rural Development
2014-02-03SenateRepresentative Friend added as cosponsor.
2014-02-03SenateRepresentative Lehe added as cosponsor.
2014-02-03SenateRepresentative Clere added sponsor.
2014-02-03SenateReferred to the House
2014-02-03SenateSenator Boots added as coauthor.
2014-02-03SenateThird reading: Passed: Roll Call 120: yeas 48 and nays 0
2014-01-30SenateSecond reading: engrossed
2014-01-27SenateCommittee report: do pass amend, adopted.
2014-01-16SenateSenator Waterman added as coauthor.
2014-01-16SenateSenator Tallian added as coauthor.
2014-01-16SenateSenator Stoops added as coauthor.
2014-01-16SenateSenator Steele added as coauthor.
2014-01-14SenateSenator Yoder added as second author.
2014-01-14SenateFirst Reading: Referred to Agriculture and Natural Resources
2014-01-14SenateAuthored by Senator R. Young.

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2014/bills/senate/357/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/7/6/f/d76f827c/SB0357.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/b/0/b/fb0bf271/SB0357.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/b/1/c/cb1c76fe/SB0357.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/e/9/a/2e9a5f99/SB0357.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/1/4/d/f14deb11/SB0357.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/c/c/6/9cc6e72b/SB0357.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/5/a/c/15acbc00/SB0357.04.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/6/4/e/964e3aad/SB0357.04.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/7/2/3/7723f374/SB0357.05.ENRS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/4/1/9/44195fa2/SB0357.01.INTR.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/d/8/1/3d816b42/SB0357.02.COMS.120.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/d/8/3/3d83c0f9/SB0357.02.COMS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/0/6/a/206a238c/SB0357.04.ENGH.378.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/b/5/b/bb5b5fe5/SB0357.04.ENGH.475.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/c/6/5/cc65cb7f/SB0357.04.ENGH.416.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback